FL H0343 | 2022 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum:
Status: Introduced on October 19 2021 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2022-03-04 - Laid on Table, refer to CS/SB 566
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on October 19 2021 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2022-03-04 - Laid on Table, refer to CS/SB 566
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [PDF]
Summary
Revises licensing requirements for clinical social workers, marriage & family therapists, & mental health counselors.
Title
Mental Health Professional Licensure
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2022-02-01 - House - House Health & Human Services Committee (Y: 20 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2022-01-13 - House - House Professions & Public Health Subcommittee (Y: 17 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2022-01-13 - House - House Professions & Public Health Subcommittee (Y: 17 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-03-04 | House | Laid on Table, refer to CS/SB 566 |
2022-03-04 | House | Substituted CS/SB 566 |
2022-03-01 | House | Bill added to Special Order Calendar (3/4/2022) |
2022-02-04 | House | Added to Second Reading Calendar |
2022-02-04 | House | Bill referred to House Calendar |
2022-02-02 | House | 1st Reading (Committee Substitute 2) |
2022-02-02 | House | CS Filed |
2022-02-02 | House | Laid on Table under Rule 7.18(a) |
2022-02-02 | House | Reported out of Health & Human Services Committee |
2022-02-01 | House | Favorable with CS by Health & Human Services Committee |
2022-01-28 | House | Added to Health & Human Services Committee agenda |
2022-01-14 | House | Now in Health & Human Services Committee |
2022-01-14 | House | Referred to Health & Human Services Committee |
2022-01-14 | House | 1st Reading (Committee Substitute 1) |
2022-01-13 | House | CS Filed |
2022-01-13 | House | Laid on Table under Rule 7.18(a) |
2022-01-13 | House | Reported out of Professions & Public Health Subcommittee |
2022-01-13 | House | Favorable with CS by Professions & Public Health Subcommittee |
2022-01-11 | House | 1st Reading (Original Filed Version) |
2022-01-11 | House | Added to Professions & Public Health Subcommittee agenda |
2021-11-05 | House | Now in Professions & Public Health Subcommittee |
2021-11-05 | House | Referred to Health & Human Services Committee |
2021-11-05 | House | Referred to Professions & Public Health Subcommittee |
2021-10-19 | House | Filed |
Same As/Similar To
S566 (Same As) 2022-04-08 - Chapter No. 2022-29
S768 (Similar To) 2022-04-20 - Chapter No. 2022-71
H693 (Similar To) 2022-03-08 - Laid on Table, refer to CS/CS/SB 768
S768 (Similar To) 2022-04-20 - Chapter No. 2022-71
H693 (Similar To) 2022-03-08 - Laid on Table, refer to CS/CS/SB 768