FL H0693 | 2022 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Introduced on November 22 2021 - 25% progression
Action: 2022-01-21 - PCS added to Professions & Public Health Subcommittee agenda
Pending: House Professions and Public Health Subcommittee Committee
Hearing: Jan 25 @ 9:00 am House Professions & Public Health Subcommittee Hearing
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]

Summary

Revises purpose of department's targeted outreach program for certain pregnant women; requires department to educate pregnant women who have HIV on certain information; authorizes department to select samples of marijuana from medical marijuana treatment center facilities for certain testing; revises provisions relating to licensure of midwives, orthotist & prosthetist registration, examination, & licensing, clinical laboratory directors, psychologist licensing, clinical social workers, marriage & family therapists, & mental health counselors.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Pro trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Department of Health

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2022-01-21HousePCS added to Professions & Public Health Subcommittee agenda
2022-01-11House1st Reading (Original Filed Version)
2021-12-13HouseNow in Professions & Public Health Subcommittee
2021-12-13HouseReferred to Health & Human Services Committee
2021-12-13HouseReferred to Professions & Public Health Subcommittee
2021-11-22HouseFiled

Same As/Similar To

S768 (Same As) 2022-01-21 - On Committee agenda-- Health Policy, 01/26/22, 10:00 am, 412 Knott Building
H343 (Similar To) 2022-01-14 - Now in Health & Human Services Committee
H679 (Similar To) 2022-01-11 - 1st Reading (Original Filed Version)
S566 (Similar To) 2022-01-11 - CS by Health Policy read 1st time
S1144 (Similar To) 2022-01-11 - Introduced
S1268 (Similar To) 2022-01-11 - Introduced
H1321 (Similar To) 2022-01-14 - Now in Professions & Public Health Subcommittee

Code Citations

ChapterArticleSectionCitation TypeStatute Text
3810045Amended CodeSee Bill Text
3810303Amended CodeSee Bill Text
381986Amended CodeSee Bill Text
40123Amended CodeSee Bill Text
40125Amended CodeSee Bill Text
40127Amended CodeSee Bill Text
4012701Amended CodeSee Bill Text
401272Amended CodeSee Bill Text
40130Amended CodeSee Bill Text
40134Amended CodeSee Bill Text
401425Amended CodeSee Bill Text
401435Amended CodeSee Bill Text
460406Amended CodeSee Bill Text
464008Amended CodeSee Bill Text
464018Amended CodeSee Bill Text
467003Amended CodeSee Bill Text
467009Amended CodeSee Bill Text
467011Amended CodeSee Bill Text
4670125Amended CodeSee Bill Text
467205Amended CodeSee Bill Text
468803Amended CodeSee Bill Text
483824Amended CodeSee Bill Text
490003Amended CodeSee Bill Text
490005Amended CodeSee Bill Text
4900051Amended CodeSee Bill Text
491005Amended CodeSee Bill Text
766314Amended CodeSee Bill Text

Florida State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback