FL S0548 | 2022 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Failed on March 14 2022 - 100% progression
Action: 2022-03-14 - Died in Regulated Industries
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Failed on March 14 2022 - 100% progression
Action: 2022-03-14 - Died in Regulated Industries
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Establishing a tax credit for electricity produced from a renewable energy source located on an operational farm in this state; authorizing the Board of Trustees of the Internal Improvement Trust Fund to lease manmade stormwater management systems for floating solar energy systems; requiring the Public Service Commission, in consultation with the Department of Agriculture and Consumer Services and the Department of Environmental Protection, to adopt rules for a renewable and energy efficiency portfolio standard; establishing the Residential Energy Efficiency Upgrades Program within the Department of Agriculture and Consumer Services for a specified purpose, etc.
Title
Energy
Sponsors
Sen. Tina Polsky [D] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-03-14 | Senate | Died in Regulated Industries |
2022-03-12 | Senate | Indefinitely postponed and withdrawn from consideration |
2022-01-11 | Senate | Introduced |
2021-11-03 | Senate | Referred to Regulated Industries; Finance and Tax; Appropriations |
2021-10-19 | Senate | Filed |
Same As/Similar To
H81 (Similar To) 2022-03-14 - Died in Tourism, Infrastructure & Energy Subcommittee
S366 (Similar To) 2022-03-14 - Died in Environment and Natural Resources
H491 (Same As) 2022-03-14 - Died in Tourism, Infrastructure & Energy Subcommittee
S366 (Similar To) 2022-03-14 - Died in Environment and Natural Resources
H491 (Same As) 2022-03-14 - Died in Tourism, Infrastructure & Energy Subcommittee
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
213 | 053 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
220 | 02 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
220 | 13 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
220 | 1931 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
252 | 385 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
253 | 471 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
255 | 257 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
366 | 921 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
377 | 7061 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
377 | 817 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
377 | 818 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
377 | 819 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
377 | 8201 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
520 | 27 | Amended Code | See Bill Text |
Florida State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.flsenate.gov/Session/Bill/2022/548 |
Text | https://www.flsenate.gov/Session/Bill/2022/548/BillText/Filed/HTML |