FL S0528 | 2019 | Regular Session

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Failed on May 3 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-05-03 - Died in Appropriations, companion bill(s) passed, see CS/CS/HB 369 (Ch. 2019-159)
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [HTML]

Summary

Defining the term "peer specialist"; requiring a specific level of screening for peer specialists working in mental health programs and facilities; authorizing a person to seek certification as a peer specialist if he or she meets specified qualifications; requiring the Department of Children and Families to develop a training program for peer specialists and to give preference to trainers who are certified peer specialists; requiring recovery residences to comply with specified Florida Fire Prevention Code provisions, etc.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Mental Health and Substance Use Disorders

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2019-05-03SenateDied in Appropriations, companion bill(s) passed, see CS/CS/HB 369 (Ch. 2019-159)
2019-05-03SenateIndefinitely postponed and withdrawn from consideration
2019-04-18SenateOn Committee agenda-- Appropriations, 04/18/19, 9:00 am, 412 Knott Building --Not Considered
2019-03-14SenateNow in Appropriations
2019-03-13SenateSubcommittee Recommendation: Favorable by Appropriations Subcommittee on Health and Human Services; YEAS 10 NAYS 0
2019-03-08SenateOn Committee agenda-- Appropriations Subcommittee on Health and Human Services, 03/13/19, 4:00 pm, 412 Knott Building
2019-03-05SenateCS by Children, Families, and Elder Affairs read 1st time
2019-03-05SenateIntroduced
2019-02-22SenateNow in Appropriations Subcommittee on Health and Human Services
2019-02-20SenatePending reference review under Rule 4.7(2) - (Committee Substitute)
2019-02-19SenateCS by Children, Families, and Elder Affairs; YEAS 6 NAYS 0
2019-02-12SenateOn Committee agenda-- Children, Families, and Elder Affairs, 02/19/19, 12:30 pm, 301 Senate Building
2019-02-08SenateReferred to Children, Families, and Elder Affairs; Appropriations Subcommittee on Health and Human Services; Appropriations
2019-01-25SenateFiled

Same As/Similar To

H369 (Similar To) 2019-06-28 - Chapter No. 2019-159
S900 (Similar To) 2019-05-02 - Laid on Table, companion bill(s) passed, see CS/CS/HB 369 (Ch. 2019-159)
H1187 (Similar To) 2019-05-03 - Died in Children, Families, and Elder Affairs, companion bill(s) passed, see CS/CS/HB 369 (Ch. 2019-159), CS/HB 7125 (Ch. 2019-167)

Code Citations

ChapterArticleSectionCitation TypeStatute Text
212055Amended CodeSee Bill Text
394455Amended CodeSee Bill Text
3944572Amended CodeSee Bill Text
3944573Amended CodeSee Bill Text
394495Amended CodeSee Bill Text
394496Amended CodeSee Bill Text
3949085Amended CodeSee Bill Text
397311Amended CodeSee Bill Text
3974073Amended CodeSee Bill Text
397416Amended CodeSee Bill Text
397417Amended CodeSee Bill Text
397487Amended CodeSee Bill Text
3974873Amended CodeSee Bill Text
409972Amended CodeSee Bill Text
43507Amended CodeSee Bill Text
440102Amended CodeSee Bill Text
464012Amended CodeSee Bill Text
7442007Amended CodeSee Bill Text

Florida State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback