FL H1187 | 2019 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 5-2-1)
Status: Introduced on March 1 2019 - 25% progression
Action: 2019-04-17 - CS passed; YEAS 114 NAYS 0
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [PDF]

Summary

Authorizes certification of peer specialists to provide recovery services in mental health programs & facilities; requires peer specialists to meet specified criteria & background screening requirements; authorizes exemption of certain persons from disqualification of employment; requires department to approve credentialing entities for peer specialists certification; requires new background screening for service provider personnel; revises applicability of exemptions from licensure & provides exemption from certain licensure renewal requirements for certain entities & programs.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Mental Health and Substance Use Disorders

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2019-04-17 - House - House: Third Reading RCS#172 (Y: 114 N: 0 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2019-04-17HouseCS passed; YEAS 114 NAYS 0
2019-04-17HouseRead 3rd time
2019-04-17HouseRead 2nd time
2019-04-11HousePlaced on Special Order Calendar, 04/17/19
2019-04-05HousePlaced on Calendar
2019-04-04HouseCS/CS by Health and Human Services Committee read 1st time
2019-04-04HousePending review of CS -under Rule 7.18(c)
2019-04-03HouseCS/CS by- Health and Human Services Committee; YEAS 14 NAYS 0
2019-04-01HouseOn Committee agenda-- Health and Human Services Committee, 04/03/19, 9:00 am, Morris Hall
2019-03-25HouseNow in Health and Human Services Committee
2019-03-25HouseCS referred to Health and Human Services Committee
2019-03-25HouseOriginal reference(s) removed: Health Care Appropriations Subcommittee
2019-03-25HouseCS by Children, Families and Seniors Subcommittee read 1st time
2019-03-22HousePending review of CS under Rule 7.18(c)
2019-03-20HouseCS by Children, Families and Seniors Subcommittee; YEAS 15 NAYS 0
2019-03-18HousePCS on Committee agenda-- Children, Families and Seniors Subcommittee, 03/20/19, 9:00 am, 12 HOB
2019-03-08HouseReferred to Children, Families and Seniors Subcommittee; Health Care Appropriations Subcommittee; Health and Human Services Committee
2019-03-05HouseIntroduced
2019-03-01HouseFiled

Same As/Similar To

S528 (Similar To) 2019-04-18 - On Committee agenda-- Appropriations, 04/18/19, 9:00 am, 412 Knott Building --Not Considered
H369 (Similar To) 2019-04-18 - Placed on Special Order Calendar, 04/23/19
S900 (Similar To) 2019-04-11 - Now in Appropriations

Code Citations

ChapterArticleSectionCitation TypeStatute Text
212055Amended CodeSee Bill Text
394455Amended CodeSee Bill Text
394457Amended CodeSee Bill Text
3944572Amended CodeSee Bill Text
3944573Amended CodeSee Bill Text
394495Amended CodeSee Bill Text
394496Amended CodeSee Bill Text
3949085Amended CodeSee Bill Text
397311Amended CodeSee Bill Text
3974012Amended CodeSee Bill Text
397403Amended CodeSee Bill Text
3974073Amended CodeSee Bill Text
397416Amended CodeSee Bill Text
397417Amended CodeSee Bill Text
409972Amended CodeSee Bill Text
43507Amended CodeSee Bill Text
440102Amended CodeSee Bill Text
464012Amended CodeSee Bill Text
7442007Amended CodeSee Bill Text

Florida State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback