FL H0369 | 2019 | Regular Session

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum:
Status: Passed on June 28 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-06-28 - Chapter No. 2019-159
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]

Summary

Authorizes DCF & AHCA to grant exemptions from disqualification for service provider personnel to work in certain treatment programs, facilities, or recovery residences; revises background screening requirements & exemptions from disqualification for certain service provider personnel; provides qualifications for peer specialists; authorizes DCF to approve certain credentialing entities to certify peer specialists; provides for review of certain decisions made by department-recognized credentialing entities; provides certain prohibitions & penalties.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Substance Abuse Services

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2019-05-03 - Senate - Senate: Third Reading RCS#18 (Y: 37 N: 0 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-04-24 - House - House: Third Reading RCS#195 (Y: 113 N: 0 NV: 4 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2019-06-28 Chapter No. 2019-159
2019-06-27 Approved by Governor
2019-06-26 Signed by Officers and presented to Governor
2019-05-03HouseOrdered enrolled
2019-05-03SenateCS passed; YEAS 37 NAYS 0
2019-05-03SenateRead 3rd time
2019-05-02SenatePlaced on 3rd reading
2019-05-02SenateRead 2nd time
2019-05-02SenateSubstituted for CS/SB 900
2019-05-02SenatePlaced on Calendar, on 2nd reading
2019-05-02SenateWithdrawn from Children, Families, and Elder Affairs; Appropriations Subcommittee on Health and Human Services; Appropriations
2019-04-25SenateReceived
2019-04-24SenateReferred to Children, Families, and Elder Affairs; Appropriations Subcommittee on Health and Human Services; Appropriations
2019-04-24SenateIn Messages
2019-04-24HouseCS passed; YEAS 113 NAYS 0
2019-04-24HouseRead 3rd time
2019-04-23HousePlaced on 3rd reading
2019-04-23HouseRead 2nd time
2019-04-18HousePlaced on Special Order Calendar, 04/23/19
2019-03-18HousePlaced on Calendar
2019-03-15HouseCS/CS by Health and Human Services Committee read 1st time
2019-03-15HousePending review of CS -under Rule 7.18(c)
2019-03-14HouseCS/CS by- Health and Human Services Committee; YEAS 17 NAYS 0
2019-03-12HouseOn Committee agenda-- Health and Human Services Committee, 03/14/19, 12:00 pm, Morris Hall
2019-03-08HouseNow in Health and Human Services Committee
2019-03-08HouseCS referred to Health and Human Services Committee
2019-03-08HouseOriginal reference(s) removed: Health Care Appropriations Subcommittee
2019-03-07HouseCS by Children, Families and Seniors Subcommittee read 1st time
2019-03-07HousePending review of CS under Rule 7.18(c)
2019-03-06HouseCS by Children, Families and Seniors Subcommittee; YEAS 14 NAYS 0
2019-03-05HouseIntroduced
2019-03-04HousePCS on Committee agenda-- Children, Families and Seniors Subcommittee, 03/06/19, 9:00 am, 12 HOB
2019-01-30HouseReferred to Children, Families and Seniors Subcommittee; Health Care Appropriations Subcommittee; Health and Human Services Committee
2019-01-21HouseFiled

Same As/Similar To

S528 (Similar To) 2019-05-03 - Died in Appropriations, companion bill(s) passed, see CS/CS/HB 369 (Ch. 2019-159)
S900 (Similar To) 2019-05-02 - Laid on Table, companion bill(s) passed, see CS/CS/HB 369 (Ch. 2019-159)
H1187 (Similar To) 2019-05-03 - Died in Children, Families, and Elder Affairs, companion bill(s) passed, see CS/CS/HB 369 (Ch. 2019-159), CS/HB 7125 (Ch. 2019-167)

Code Citations

ChapterArticleSectionCitation TypeStatute Text
212055Amended CodeSee Bill Text
3944572Amended CodeSee Bill Text
397311Amended CodeSee Bill Text
397321Amended CodeSee Bill Text
3974073Amended CodeSee Bill Text
3974075Amended CodeSee Bill Text
397416Amended CodeSee Bill Text
397417Amended CodeSee Bill Text
397487Amended CodeSee Bill Text
3974873Amended CodeSee Bill Text
39755Amended CodeSee Bill Text
43507Amended CodeSee Bill Text
440102Amended CodeSee Bill Text
55380Amended CodeSee Bill Text
633206Amended CodeSee Bill Text
817505Amended CodeSee Bill Text

Florida State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback