FL S0900 | 2019 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum:
Status: Introduced on February 8 2019 - 25% progression
Action: 2019-05-02 - Laid on Table, companion bill(s) passed, see CS/CS/HB 369 (Ch. 2019-159)
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [HTML]

Summary

Authorizing the Department of Children and Families and the Agency for Health Care Administration to grant exemptions from disqualification for certain service provider personnel; requiring individuals screened on or after a specified date to undergo specified background screening; increasing the criminal penalty for certain unlawful activities relating to personnel; prohibiting an individual who is not a certified peer specialist from advertising or providing recovery services unless the person is exempt; authorizing the department, a behavioral health managing entity, or the Medicaid program to reimburse peer specialist services as a recovery service, etc.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Substance Abuse Services

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2019-05-02SenateLaid on Table, companion bill(s) passed, see CS/CS/HB 369 (Ch. 2019-159)
2019-05-02SenateSubstituted CS/CS/HB 369
2019-05-02SenateRead 2nd time
2019-05-02SenatePlaced on Special Order Calendar, 05/02/19
2019-05-02SenatePlaced on Calendar, on 2nd reading
2019-05-02SenateWithdrawn from Appropriations
2019-04-11SenateNow in Appropriations
2019-04-09SenateSubcommittee Recommendation: CS/CS by Appropriations Subcommittee on Health and Human Services; YEAS 10 NAYS 0
2019-04-04SenateOn Committee agenda-- Appropriations Subcommittee on Health and Human Services, 04/09/19, 4:00 pm, 412 Knott Building
2019-03-14SenateCS by Children, Families, and Elder Affairs read 1st time
2019-03-13SenateNow in Appropriations Subcommittee on Health and Human Services
2019-03-12SenatePending reference review under Rule 4.7(2) - (Committee Substitute)
2019-03-11SenateCS by Children, Families, and Elder Affairs; YEAS 7 NAYS 0
2019-03-06SenateOn Committee agenda-- Children, Families, and Elder Affairs, 03/11/19, 4:00 pm, 301 Senate Building
2019-03-05SenateIntroduced
2019-02-19SenateReferred to Children, Families, and Elder Affairs; Appropriations Subcommittee on Health and Human Services; Appropriations
2019-02-08SenateFiled

Same As/Similar To

H369 (Similar To) 2019-06-28 - Chapter No. 2019-159
S528 (Similar To) 2019-05-03 - Died in Appropriations, companion bill(s) passed, see CS/CS/HB 369 (Ch. 2019-159)
H1187 (Similar To) 2019-05-03 - Died in Children, Families, and Elder Affairs, companion bill(s) passed, see CS/CS/HB 369 (Ch. 2019-159), CS/HB 7125 (Ch. 2019-167)

Code Citations

ChapterArticleSectionCitation TypeStatute Text
212055Amended CodeSee Bill Text
3944572Amended CodeSee Bill Text
397311Amended CodeSee Bill Text
397321Amended CodeSee Bill Text
3974073Amended CodeSee Bill Text
3974075Amended CodeSee Bill Text
397416Amended CodeSee Bill Text
397417Amended CodeSee Bill Text
397487Amended CodeSee Bill Text
3974873Amended CodeSee Bill Text
39755Amended CodeSee Bill Text
43507Amended CodeSee Bill Text
440102Amended CodeSee Bill Text
55380Amended CodeSee Bill Text
633206Amended CodeSee Bill Text

Florida State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback