FL S0518 | 2020 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Failed on March 14 2020 - 100% progression
Action: 2020-03-14 - Died in Appropriations Subcommittee on Health and Human Services
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Failed on March 14 2020 - 100% progression
Action: 2020-03-14 - Died in Appropriations Subcommittee on Health and Human Services
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Revising components that are included in the postpartum evaluation and followup care required to be provided by birth centers to include a cardiac screening of the newborn; requiring hospitals that provide birthing services to provide a postpartum evaluation that includes the cardiovascular screening of each newborn, etc.
Title
Cardiac Screening for Newborns
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-03-14 | Senate | Died in Appropriations Subcommittee on Health and Human Services |
2020-03-14 | Senate | Indefinitely postponed and withdrawn from consideration |
2020-01-15 | Senate | Now in Appropriations Subcommittee on Health and Human Services |
2020-01-14 | Senate | Favorable by Health Policy; YEAS 10 NAYS 0 |
2020-01-14 | Senate | Introduced |
2020-01-09 | Senate | On Committee agenda-- Health Policy, 01/14/20, 2:30 pm, 412 Knott Building |
2019-11-01 | Senate | Referred to Health Policy; Appropriations Subcommittee on Health and Human Services; Appropriations |
2019-10-16 | Senate | Filed |
Same As/Similar To
H823 (Same As) 2020-03-14 - Died in Health Market Reform Subcommittee
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
383 | 318 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
395 | 1053 | Amended Code | See Bill Text |
Florida State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.flsenate.gov/Session/Bill/2020/518 |
Text | https://www.flsenate.gov/Session/Bill/2020/518/BillText/Filed/HTML |