FL H0823 | 2020 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Failed on March 14 2020 - 100% progression
Action: 2020-03-14 - Died in Health Market Reform Subcommittee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Failed on March 14 2020 - 100% progression
Action: 2020-03-14 - Died in Health Market Reform Subcommittee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Requires postpartum evaluation & followup care provided by birth centers to include cardiac screening of newborns; requires certain hospitals to provide postpartum evaluation that includes cardiovascular screening of newborns.
Title
Cardiac Screening for Newborns
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-03-14 | House | Died in Health Market Reform Subcommittee |
2020-03-14 | House | Indefinitely postponed and withdrawn from consideration |
2020-01-14 | House | Introduced |
2019-12-16 | House | Referred to Health Market Reform Subcommittee; Appropriations Committee; Health and Human Services Committee |
2019-11-27 | House | Filed |
Same As/Similar To
S518 (Same As) 2020-03-14 - Died in Appropriations Subcommittee on Health and Human Services
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
383 | 318 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
395 | 1053 | Amended Code | See Bill Text |
Florida State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.flsenate.gov/Session/Bill/2020/823 |
Text | https://www.flsenate.gov/Session/Bill/2020/823/BillText/Filed/PDF |