FL S0518 | 2015 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Failed on May 1 2015 - 100% progression
Action: 2015-05-01 - Died in Appropriations
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Failed on May 1 2015 - 100% progression
Action: 2015-05-01 - Died in Appropriations
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Revising provisions relating to calculation of the kindergarten readiness rate for Voluntary Prekindergarten Education Program providers and schools; requiring the administration of a preassessment and postassessment to students based upon adopted performance standards, etc.
Title
Voluntary Prekindergarten Education Program
Sponsors
Sen. Audrey Gibson [D] | Sen. Don Gaetz [R] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2015-05-01 | Senate | Died in Appropriations |
2015-04-02 | Senate | Now in Appropriations |
2015-04-02 | Senate | Subcommittee Recommendation: Favorable by Appropriations Subcommittee on Education; YEAS 7 NAYS 0 |
2015-03-30 | Senate | On Committee agenda-- Appropriations Subcommittee on Education, 04/02/15, 9:00 am, 412 Knott Building |
2015-03-12 | Senate | Now in Appropriations Subcommittee on Education |
2015-03-11 | Senate | Favorable by Education Pre-K - 12; YEAS 11 NAYS 0 |
2015-03-06 | Senate | On Committee agenda-- Education Pre-K - 12, 03/11/15, 2:00 pm, 412 Knott Building |
2015-03-03 | Senate | Introduced |
2015-02-03 | Senate | Referred to Education Pre-K - 12; Appropriations Subcommittee on Education; Appropriations |
2015-01-26 | Senate | Filed |
Same As/Similar To
H0483 (Same As) 2015-04-28 - Died in Choice and Innovation Subcommittee
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
1002 | 53 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
1002 | 67 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
1002 | 69 | Amended Code | See Bill Text |
Florida State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | http://www.flsenate.gov/Session/Bill/2015/518 |
Text | http://www.flsenate.gov/Session/Bill/2015/0518/BillText/Filed/HTML |