FL S0516 | 2017 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Failed on May 5 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-05-05 - Died in Banking and Insurance
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Failed on May 5 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-05-05 - Died in Banking and Insurance
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Deleting provisions that limit certain workers' compensation benefits for first responders; providing that mental or nervous injuries of law enforcement officers, firefighters, emergency medical technicians, or paramedics are compensable under the Workers' Compensation Law under specified conditions, etc.
Title
Workers' Compensation Benefits for First Responders
Sponsors
Sen. Keith Perry [R] | Sen. Dana Young [R] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2017-05-05 | Senate | Died in Banking and Insurance |
2017-05-05 | Senate | Indefinitely postponed and withdrawn from consideration |
2017-03-07 | Senate | Introduced |
2017-02-09 | Senate | Referred to Banking and Insurance; Appropriations Subcommittee on General Government; Appropriations; Rules |
2017-01-26 | Senate | Filed |
Same As/Similar To
H1019 (Similar To) 2017-05-05 - Died in Oversight, Transparency and Administration Subcommittee
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
112 | 1815 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
440 | 093 | Amended Code | See Bill Text |
Florida State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | http://www.flsenate.gov/Session/Bill/2017/516 |
Text | http://www.flsenate.gov/Session/Bill/2017/0516/BillText/Filed/HTML |