FL H1019 | 2017 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 6-1)
Status: Failed on May 5 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-05-05 - Died in Oversight, Transparency and Administration Subcommittee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 6-1)
Status: Failed on May 5 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-05-05 - Died in Oversight, Transparency and Administration Subcommittee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Deletes provisions that limit certain workers' compensation benefits for first responders; provides that mental or nervous injuries of law enforcement officers, firefighters, emergency medical technicians, or paramedics are compensable under Workers' Compensation Law under specified conditions.
Title
Workers' Compensation Benefits For First Responders
Sponsors
Rep. Mike Miller [R] | Rep. Bruce Antone [D] | Rep. Kamia Brown [D] | Rep. John Cortes [D] |
Rep. Joseph Geller [D] | Rep. Evan Jenne [D] | Rep. Carlos Smith [D] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2017-05-05 | House | Died in Oversight, Transparency and Administration Subcommittee |
2017-05-05 | House | Indefinitely postponed and withdrawn from consideration |
2017-03-07 | House | Introduced |
2017-03-01 | House | Referred to Oversight, Transparency and Administration Subcommittee; Government Operations and Technology Appropriations Subcommittee; Government Accountability Committee |
2017-02-23 | House | Filed |
Same As/Similar To
S0516 (Similar To) 2017-05-05 - Died in Banking and Insurance
S1088 (Similar To) 2017-05-05 - Died in Appropriations Subcommittee on General Government
S1088 (Similar To) 2017-05-05 - Died in Appropriations Subcommittee on General Government
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
112 | 1815 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
440 | 093 | Amended Code | See Bill Text |
Florida State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | http://www.flsenate.gov/Session/Bill/2017/1019 |
Text | http://www.flsenate.gov/Session/Bill/2017/1019/BillText/Filed/PDF |