FL S0514 | 2018 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Introduced on October 11 2017 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2018-02-21 - Laid on Table, refer to CS/CS/HB 429
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on October 11 2017 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2018-02-21 - Laid on Table, refer to CS/CS/HB 429
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [HTML]
Summary
Requiring the Department of Health to develop and publish an educational pamphlet which contains certain information on the risks and benefits of transplants; requiring the department to notify physicians of the availability of the pamphlet, etc.
Title
Transplant of Human Tissue
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-02-21 | Senate | Laid on Table, refer to CS/CS/HB 429 |
2018-02-21 | Senate | Substituted CS/CS/HB 429 |
2018-02-21 | Senate | Read 2nd time |
2018-02-19 | Senate | Placed on Special Order Calendar, 02/21/18 |
2018-02-07 | Senate | Placed on Calendar, on 2nd reading |
2018-02-07 | Senate | Favorable by- Rules; YEAS 11 NAYS 0 |
2018-02-02 | Senate | On Committee agenda-- Rules, 02/07/18, 4:00 pm, 110 Senate Office Building |
2018-01-31 | Senate | Now in Rules |
2018-01-30 | Senate | Favorable by Judiciary; YEAS 10 NAYS 0 |
2018-01-25 | Senate | On Committee agenda-- Judiciary, 01/30/18, 2:00 pm, 110 Senate Office Building |
2018-01-25 | Senate | Now in Judiciary |
2018-01-24 | Senate | CS by Health Policy read 1st time |
2018-01-24 | Senate | Pending reference review under Rule 4.7(2) - (Committee Substitute) |
2018-01-23 | Senate | CS by Health Policy; YEAS 8 NAYS 0 |
2018-01-18 | Senate | On Committee agenda-- Health Policy, 01/23/18, 3:30 pm, 412 Knott Building |
2018-01-09 | Senate | Introduced |
2017-10-26 | Senate | Referred to Health Policy; Judiciary; Rules |
2017-10-11 | Senate | Filed |
Same As/Similar To
H429 (Similar To) 2018-03-21 - Chapter No. 2018-36