FL S0512 | 2016 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Failed on March 11 2016 - 100% progression
Action: 2016-03-11 - Died in Judiciary
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Failed on March 11 2016 - 100% progression
Action: 2016-03-11 - Died in Judiciary
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Deleting a requirement that a marriage license may be issued by a county court judge or clerk of the circuit court in this state only if one party to the marriage is male and the other party is female; deleting a provision specifying that, for the purpose of interpreting any state law or rule, the term "marriage" means only a legal union between one man and one woman as husband and wife and that the term "spouse" applies only to a member of such a union, etc.
Title
Marriage
Sponsors
Sen. Darren Soto [D] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2016-03-11 | Senate | Died in Judiciary |
2016-01-12 | Senate | Introduced |
2015-10-21 | Senate | Referred to Judiciary; Appropriations Subcommittee on Criminal and Civil Justice; Rules |
2015-10-12 | Senate | Filed |
Same As/Similar To
H4019 (Similar To) 2016-03-11 - Died in Civil Justice Subcommittee
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
741 | 04 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
741 | 212 | Amended Code | See Bill Text |
Florida State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | http://www.flsenate.gov/Session/Bill/2016/512 |
Text | http://www.flsenate.gov/Session/Bill/2016/0512/BillText/Filed/HTML |