FL H4019 | 2016 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Failed on March 11 2016 - 100% progression
Action: 2016-03-11 - Died in Civil Justice Subcommittee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Failed on March 11 2016 - 100% progression
Action: 2016-03-11 - Died in Civil Justice Subcommittee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Deletes requirement that marriage license only be issued to one male & one female; deletes provision specifying that term "marriage" in statute or rule means only legal union between one man & one woman as husband & wife & that term "spouse" applies only to member of such union.
Title
Marriage/Issuance of Marriage Licenses to Persons of the Same Sex
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2016-03-11 | House | Died in Civil Justice Subcommittee |
2016-01-12 | House | Introduced |
2015-10-07 | House | Referred to Civil Justice Subcommittee; Justice Appropriations Subcommittee; Judiciary Committee |
2015-09-22 | House | Filed |
Same As/Similar To
S0512 (Similar To) 2016-03-11 - Died in Judiciary
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
741 | 04 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
741 | 212 | Amended Code | See Bill Text |
Florida State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | http://www.flsenate.gov/Session/Bill/2016/4019 |
Text | http://www.flsenate.gov/Session/Bill/2016/4019/BillText/Filed/PDF |