FL S0364 | 2022 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Enrolled on March 9 2022 - 75% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2022-06-08 - Signed by Officers and presented to Governor
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Status: Enrolled on March 9 2022 - 75% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2022-06-08 - Signed by Officers and presented to Governor
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Summary
Revising the presale voucher requirements for out-of-state college or university license plates; revising the calculation of certain independent college and university specialty license plate sales for certain determinations; requiring the department to continue to collect annual use fees for certain discontinued or replaced plates; revising annual use fee distributions from the sale of the Live the Dream license plate; directing the department to develop specified specialty license plates, etc.
Title
Specialty License Plates
Sponsors
Senate Appropriations Committee | Senate Transportation Committee | Sen. Aaron Bean [R] | Sen. Keith Perry [R] |
Roll Calls
2022-03-09 - Senate - Senate: Third Reading RCS#14 (Y: 38 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-03-08 - House - House: Third Reading RCS#788 (Y: 105 N: 10 NV: 4 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-03-07 - House - House: Third Reading RCS#785 (Y: 107 N: 0 NV: 12 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-03-01 - Senate - Senate: Third Reading RCS#7 (Y: 38 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2022-02-24 - Senate - Senate Appropriations (Y: 20 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-02-16 - Senate - Senate Appropriations Subcommittee on Transportation, Tourism, and Economic Development (Y: 10 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2022-01-25 - Senate - Senate Transportation (Y: 8 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2022-03-08 - House - House: Third Reading RCS#788 (Y: 105 N: 10 NV: 4 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-03-07 - House - House: Third Reading RCS#785 (Y: 107 N: 0 NV: 12 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-03-01 - Senate - Senate: Third Reading RCS#7 (Y: 38 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2022-02-24 - Senate - Senate Appropriations (Y: 20 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-02-16 - Senate - Senate Appropriations Subcommittee on Transportation, Tourism, and Economic Development (Y: 10 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2022-01-25 - Senate - Senate Transportation (Y: 8 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-06-08 | Signed by Officers and presented to Governor | |
2022-03-09 | Senate | Ordered engrossed, then enrolled |
2022-03-09 | Senate | CS passed as amended; YEAS 38 NAYS 0 |
2022-03-09 | Senate | Concurred in 1 amendment(s) (027563) |
2022-03-08 | Senate | In returning messages |
2022-03-08 | House | CS passed as amended; YEAS 105, NAYS 10 |
2022-03-08 | House | Amendment 227039 ruled out of order |
2022-03-08 | House | Read 3rd time |
2022-03-07 | House | Added to Third Reading Calendar |
2022-03-07 | House | Placed on 3rd reading |
2022-03-07 | House | Amendment 027563 adopted |
2022-03-07 | House | Read 2nd time |
2022-03-04 | House | 1st Reading (Engrossed 1) |
2022-03-04 | House | Bill added to Special Order Calendar (3/7/2022) |
2022-03-04 | House | Bill referred to House Calendar |
2022-03-01 | House | In Messages |
2022-03-01 | Senate | CS passed as amended; YEAS 38 NAYS 0 |
2022-03-01 | Senate | Read 3rd time |
2022-03-01 | Senate | Amendment(s) adopted (767578) |
2022-03-01 | Senate | Read 2nd time |
2022-02-28 | Senate | CS/CS by Appropriations read 1st time |
2022-02-25 | Senate | Placed on Special Order Calendar, 03/01/22 |
2022-02-25 | Senate | Placed on Calendar, on 2nd reading |
2022-02-25 | Senate | Pending reference review -under Rule 4.7(2) - (Committee Substitute) |
2022-02-24 | Senate | CS/CS by- Appropriations; YEAS 20 NAYS 0 |
2022-02-21 | Senate | On Committee agenda-- Appropriations, 02/24/22, 9:00 am, 412 Knott Building |
2022-02-18 | Senate | Now in Appropriations |
2022-02-16 | Senate | Subcommittee Recommendation: CS/CS by Appropriations Subcommittee on Transportation, Tourism, and Economic Development; YEAS 10 NAYS 0 |
2022-02-11 | Senate | On Committee agenda-- Appropriations Subcommittee on Transportation, Tourism, and Economic Development, 02/16/22, 10:00 am, 110 Senate Building |
2022-01-27 | Senate | CS by Transportation read 1st time |
2022-01-27 | Senate | Now in Appropriations Subcommittee on Transportation, Tourism, and Economic Development |
2022-01-26 | Senate | Pending reference review under Rule 4.7(2) - (Committee Substitute) |
2022-01-25 | Senate | CS by Transportation; YEAS 8 NAYS 0 |
2022-01-20 | Senate | On Committee agenda-- Transportation, 01/25/22, 3:30 pm, 110 Senate Building |
2022-01-11 | Senate | Introduced |
2021-10-13 | Senate | Referred to Transportation; Appropriations Subcommittee on Transportation, Tourism, and Economic Development; Appropriations |
2021-09-28 | Senate | Filed |
Same As/Similar To
H891 (Same As) 2022-03-14 - Died in Commerce Committee
H67 (Similar To) 2022-03-07 - Laid on Table, refer to CS/CS/SB 364
H141 (Similar To) 2022-03-14 - Died in Commerce Committee
H163 (Similar To) 2022-03-14 - Died in Tourism, Infrastructure & Energy Subcommittee
H213 (Similar To) 2022-03-14 - Died in Commerce Committee
H355 (Similar To) 2022-03-14 - Died in Commerce Committee
S166 (Similar To) 2022-03-14 - Died in Transportation
S194 (Similar To) 2022-03-14 - Died in Transportation
S300 (Similar To) 2022-03-14 - Died in Transportation
S424 (Similar To) 2022-03-14 - Died in Transportation
S724 (Similar To) 2022-03-14 - Died in Transportation
S814 (Similar To) 2022-03-14 - Died in Transportation
S1328 (Similar To) 2022-03-14 - Died in Transportation
S1410 (Similar To) 2022-03-14 - Died in Transportation
H67 (Similar To) 2022-03-07 - Laid on Table, refer to CS/CS/SB 364
H141 (Similar To) 2022-03-14 - Died in Commerce Committee
H163 (Similar To) 2022-03-14 - Died in Tourism, Infrastructure & Energy Subcommittee
H213 (Similar To) 2022-03-14 - Died in Commerce Committee
H355 (Similar To) 2022-03-14 - Died in Commerce Committee
S166 (Similar To) 2022-03-14 - Died in Transportation
S194 (Similar To) 2022-03-14 - Died in Transportation
S300 (Similar To) 2022-03-14 - Died in Transportation
S424 (Similar To) 2022-03-14 - Died in Transportation
S724 (Similar To) 2022-03-14 - Died in Transportation
S814 (Similar To) 2022-03-14 - Died in Transportation
S1328 (Similar To) 2022-03-14 - Died in Transportation
S1410 (Similar To) 2022-03-14 - Died in Transportation
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
320 | 08053 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
320 | 08056 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
320 | 08058 | Amended Code | See Bill Text |