FL S0300 | 2022 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Introduced on September 22 2021 - 25% progression
Action: 2022-01-11 - Introduced
Pending: Senate Transportation Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]

Summary

Directing the Department of Highway Safety and Motor Vehicles to develop a Pap Corps Champions for Cancer Research license plate; providing for distribution and use of fees collected from the sale of the plate, etc.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Pro trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Specialty License Plates/Pap Corps Champions for Cancer Research

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2022-01-11SenateIntroduced
2021-10-13SenateReferred to Transportation; Appropriations Subcommittee on Transportation, Tourism, and Economic Development; Appropriations
2021-09-22SenateFiled

Same As/Similar To

S364 (Similar To) 2022-01-27 - CS by Transportation read 1st time

Code Citations

ChapterArticleSectionCitation TypeStatute Text
32008058Amended CodeSee Bill Text

Florida State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback