FL H0141 | 2022 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 2-1)
Status: Failed on March 14 2022 - 100% progression
Action: 2022-03-14 - Died in Commerce Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [PDF]
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 2-1)
Status: Failed on March 14 2022 - 100% progression
Action: 2022-03-14 - Died in Commerce Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [PDF]
Summary
Directs DHSMV to create Blue Angels motorcycle specialty license plate; provides design & issuance requirements; provides for distribution & use of annual use fees received from sale of plate; provides for transfer of plate to replacement vehicle; authorizes DHSMV to issue personalized prestige plates in accordance with certain provisions.
Title
Motorcycle Specialty License Plates
Sponsors
House Tourism, Infrastructure and Energy Subcommittee | Rep. Michelle Salzman [R] | Rep. Sam Killebrew [R] |
Roll Calls
2021-12-02 - House - House Tourism, Infrastructure & Energy Subcommittee (Y: 16 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-03-14 | House | Died in Commerce Committee |
2022-03-12 | House | Indefinitely postponed and withdrawn from consideration |
2022-01-11 | House | 1st Reading (Committee Substitute 1) |
2022-01-11 | House | 1st Reading (Original Filed Version) |
2021-12-07 | House | Now in Commerce Committee |
2021-12-07 | House | Referred to Commerce Committee |
2021-12-03 | House | CS Filed |
2021-12-03 | House | Laid on Table under Rule 7.18(a) |
2021-12-03 | House | Reported out of Tourism, Infrastructure & Energy Subcommittee |
2021-12-02 | House | Favorable with CS by Tourism, Infrastructure & Energy Subcommittee |
2021-11-23 | House | Added to Tourism, Infrastructure & Energy Subcommittee agenda |
2021-09-29 | House | Now in Tourism, Infrastructure & Energy Subcommittee |
2021-09-29 | House | Referred to Commerce Committee |
2021-09-29 | House | Referred to Tourism, Infrastructure & Energy Subcommittee |
2021-09-21 | House | Filed |
Same As/Similar To
H143 (Related) 2022-03-14 - Died in Commerce Committee
S1328 (Same As) 2022-03-14 - Died in Transportation
S1330 (Similar To) 2022-03-14 - Died in Transportation
S364 (Similar To) 2022-06-08 - Signed by Officers and presented to Governor
H67 (Similar To) 2022-03-07 - Laid on Table, refer to CS/CS/SB 364
S1328 (Same As) 2022-03-14 - Died in Transportation
S1330 (Similar To) 2022-03-14 - Died in Transportation
S364 (Similar To) 2022-06-08 - Signed by Officers and presented to Governor
H67 (Similar To) 2022-03-07 - Laid on Table, refer to CS/CS/SB 364