FL S1330 | 2022 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Failed on March 14 2022 - 100% progression
Action: 2022-03-14 - Died in Transportation
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Failed on March 14 2022 - 100% progression
Action: 2022-03-14 - Died in Transportation
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Establishing taxes and fees for a certain motorcycle specialty license plate, etc.
Title
Motorcycle Specialty License Plate Taxes and Fees/Blue Angels
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-03-14 | Senate | Died in Transportation |
2022-03-12 | Senate | Indefinitely postponed and withdrawn from consideration |
2022-01-18 | Senate | Introduced |
2022-01-12 | Senate | Referred to Transportation; Appropriations Subcommittee on Transportation, Tourism, and Economic Development; Appropriations |
2021-12-20 | Senate | Filed |
Same As/Similar To
S1328 (Related) 2022-03-14 - Died in Transportation
H143 (Same As) 2022-03-14 - Died in Commerce Committee
H141 (Similar To) 2022-03-14 - Died in Commerce Committee
H143 (Same As) 2022-03-14 - Died in Commerce Committee
H141 (Similar To) 2022-03-14 - Died in Commerce Committee
Code Citations
Florida State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.flsenate.gov/Session/Bill/2022/1330 |
Text | https://www.flsenate.gov/Session/Bill/2022/1330/BillText/Filed/HTML |