FL S0362 | 2019 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Introduced on January 17 2019 - 25% progression
Action: 2019-03-05 - Introduced
Pending: Senate Rules Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]

Summary

Proposing amendments to the State Constitution to abolish the Constitution Revision Commission, etc.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Abolishing the Constitution Revision Commission

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2019-03-05SenateIntroduced
2019-02-19SenateNow in Rules
2019-02-19SenateFavorable by Governmental Oversight and Accountability; YEAS 4 NAYS 0
2019-02-12SenateOn Committee agenda-- Governmental Oversight and Accountability, 02/19/19, 2:30 pm, 301 Senate Building
2019-02-05SenateNow in Governmental Oversight and Accountability
2019-02-04SenateFavorable by Judiciary; YEAS 5 NAYS 0
2019-01-28SenateOn Committee agenda-- Judiciary, 02/04/19, 4:00 pm, 110 Senate Building
2019-01-25SenateReferred to Judiciary; Governmental Oversight and Accountability; Rules
2019-01-17SenateFiled

Same As/Similar To

H249 (Similar To) 2019-03-15 - Now in Judiciary Committee
H251 (Similar To) 2019-03-14 - Now in Judiciary Committee

Florida State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback