FL H0249 | 2019 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Introduced on January 11 2019 - 25% progression
Action: 2019-03-21 - Favorable by- Judiciary Committee; YEAS 15 NAYS 2
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [PDF]

Summary

Proposes amendments to State Constitution to repeal establishment, membership selection & composition, & duties of Constitution Revision Commission.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Repeal of Constitution Revision Commission

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2019-03-21HouseFavorable by- Judiciary Committee; YEAS 15 NAYS 2
2019-03-19HouseOn Committee agenda-- Judiciary Committee, 03/21/19, 8:30 am, Sumner Hall
2019-03-15HouseNow in Judiciary Committee
2019-03-14HouseCS/CS by State Affairs Committee read 1st time
2019-03-14HousePending review of CS under Rule 7.18(c)
2019-03-14HouseCS/CS by State Affairs Committee; YEAS 22 NAYS 0
2019-03-12HouseOn Committee agenda-- State Affairs Committee, 03/14/19, 8:30 am, Morris Hall
2019-03-05HouseCS by Civil Justice Subcommittee read 1st time
2019-03-05HouseIntroduced
2019-02-15HouseNow in State Affairs Committee
2019-02-14HousePending review of CS under Rule 7.18(c)
2019-02-13HouseCS by Civil Justice Subcommittee; YEAS 13 NAYS 1
2019-02-06HouseOn Committee agenda-- Civil Justice Subcommittee, 02/13/19, 4:00 pm, Sumner Hall
2019-01-23HouseReferred to Civil Justice Subcommittee; State Affairs Committee; Judiciary Committee
2019-01-11HouseFiled

Same As/Similar To

H251 (Related) 2019-03-21 - Favorable by- Judiciary Committee; YEAS 15 NAYS 2
S362 (Similar To) 2019-03-05 - Introduced

Florida State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback