FL S0352 | 2021 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Introduced on December 21 2020 - 25% progression
Action: 2021-04-26 - Laid on Table, refer to HB 245
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [HTML]

Summary

Revising a short title; revising and defining terms, etc.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Pro trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Massage Therapy

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2021-04-19 - Senate - Senate Appropriations (Y: 16 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2021-03-09 - Senate - Senate Commerce and Tourism (Y: 11 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-02-04 - Senate - Senate Health Policy (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2021-04-26SenateLaid on Table, refer to HB 245
2021-04-26SenateSubstituted HB 245
2021-04-26SenateRead 2nd time
2021-04-22SenatePlaced on Special Order Calendar, 04/26/21
2021-04-20SenatePlaced on Calendar, on 2nd reading
2021-04-19SenateFavorable by- Appropriations; YEAS 16 NAYS 3
2021-04-14SenateOn Committee agenda-- Appropriations, 04/19/21, 10:00 am, 412 Knott Building
2021-03-10SenateNow in Appropriations
2021-03-09SenateFavorable by Commerce and Tourism; YEAS 11 NAYS 0
2021-03-04SenateOn Committee agenda-- Commerce and Tourism, 03/09/21, 12:30 pm, 110 Senate Building
2021-03-02SenateCS by Health Policy read 1st time
2021-03-02SenateIntroduced
2021-02-08SenateNow in Commerce and Tourism
2021-02-08SenateRemaining references corrected to Commerce and Tourism; Appropriations
2021-02-08SenateOriginal reference(s) removed: Rules
2021-02-05SenatePending reference review under Rule 4.7(2) - (Committee Substitute)
2021-02-04SenateCS by Health Policy; YEAS 9 NAYS 0
2021-01-25SenateOn Committee agenda-- Health Policy, 02/04/21, 8:30 am, 412 Knott Building
2021-01-11SenateReferred to Health Policy; Commerce and Tourism; Rules
2020-12-21SenateFiled

Same As/Similar To

H245 (Similar To) 2021-04-27 - Ordered enrolled

Code Citations

ChapterArticleSectionCitation TypeStatute Text
477013Amended CodeSee Bill Text
4770135Amended CodeSee Bill Text
4770265Amended CodeSee Bill Text
480031Amended CodeSee Bill Text
480032Amended CodeSee Bill Text
480033Amended CodeSee Bill Text
480034Amended CodeSee Bill Text
480035Amended CodeSee Bill Text
480041Amended CodeSee Bill Text
480043Amended CodeSee Bill Text
480046Amended CodeSee Bill Text
4800465Amended CodeSee Bill Text
480047Amended CodeSee Bill Text
480052Amended CodeSee Bill Text
4800535Amended CodeSee Bill Text
6276407Amended CodeSee Bill Text
6276619Amended CodeSee Bill Text
627736Amended CodeSee Bill Text
64131Amended CodeSee Bill Text
82305Amended CodeSee Bill Text

Florida State Sources

TypeSource
Summaryhttps://www.flsenate.gov/Session/Bill/2021/352
Texthttps://www.flsenate.gov/Session/Bill/2021/352/BillText/Filed/HTML
Texthttps://www.flsenate.gov/Session/Bill/2021/352/BillText/c1/HTML
Amendmenthttps://www.flsenate.gov/Session/Bill/2021/352/Amendment/776914/HTML
Supplementhttps://www.flsenate.gov/Session/Bill/2021/352/Analyses/2021s00352.pre.hp.PDF
Supplementhttps://www.flsenate.gov/Session/Bill/2021/352/Analyses/2021s00352.hp.PDF
Supplementhttps://www.flsenate.gov/Session/Bill/2021/352/Analyses/2021s00352.pre.cm.PDF
Supplementhttps://www.flsenate.gov/Session/Bill/2021/352/Analyses/2021s00352.cm.PDF
Supplementhttps://www.flsenate.gov/Session/Bill/2021/352/Analyses/2021s00352.pre.ap.PDF
Supplementhttps://www.flsenate.gov/Session/Bill/2021/352/Analyses/2021s00352.ap.PDF
Roll Callhttps://www.flsenate.gov/Session/Bill/2021/352/Vote/2021-02-04%200830AM~S00352%20Vote%20Record.PDF
Roll Callhttps://www.flsenate.gov/Session/Bill/2021/352/Vote/2021-03-09%201230PM~S00352%20Vote%20Record.PDF
Roll Callhttps://www.flsenate.gov/Session/Bill/2021/352/Vote/2021-04-19%201000AM~S00352%20Vote%20Record.PDF

Bill Comments 750

feedback