FL H0245 | 2021 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 2-1)
Status: Enrolled on April 27 2021 - 75% progression
Action: 2021-04-27 - Ordered enrolled
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]

Summary

Revises definition & purpose of massage therapy.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Pro trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Massage Therapy

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2021-04-27 - Senate - Senate: Third Reading RCS#5 (Y: 38 N: 1 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-04-01 - House - House: Third Reading RCS#48 (Y: 115 N: 0 NV: 5 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-03-18 - House - House Health & Human Services Committee (Y: 20 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2021-03-10 - House - House Insurance & Banking Subcommittee (Y: 16 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2021-03-03 - House - House Professions & Public Health Subcommittee (Y: 18 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2021-04-27HouseOrdered enrolled
2021-04-27HouseIn Messages
2021-04-27SenatePassed; YEAS 38 NAYS 1
2021-04-27SenateRead 3rd time
2021-04-26SenatePlaced on 3rd reading
2021-04-26SenateRead 2nd time
2021-04-26SenateSubstituted for CS/SB 352
2021-04-26SenatePlaced on Calendar, on 2nd reading
2021-04-26SenateWithdrawn from Appropriations
2021-04-08SenateReceived
2021-04-08SenateReferred to Appropriations
2021-04-07HouseMessage sent to senate
2021-04-07SenateIn Messages
2021-04-01HousePassed; YEAS 115, NAYS 0
2021-04-01HouseRead 3rd time
2021-03-31HouseAdded to Third Reading Calendar
2021-03-31HousePlaced on 3rd reading
2021-03-31HouseRead 2nd time
2021-03-25HouseBill added to Special Order Calendar (3/31/2021)
2021-03-18HouseAdded to Second Reading Calendar
2021-03-18HouseBill released to House Calendar
2021-03-18HouseReported out of Health & Human Services Committee
2021-03-18HouseFavorable by Health & Human Services Committee
2021-03-16HouseAdded to Health & Human Services Committee agenda
2021-03-10HouseNow in Health & Human Services Committee
2021-03-10HouseReported out of Insurance & Banking Subcommittee
2021-03-10HouseFavorable by Insurance & Banking Subcommittee
2021-03-08HouseAdded to Insurance & Banking Subcommittee agenda
2021-03-03HouseNow in Insurance & Banking Subcommittee
2021-03-03HouseReported out of Professions & Public Health Subcommittee
2021-03-03HouseFavorable by Professions & Public Health Subcommittee
2021-03-02House1st Reading (Original Filed Version)
2021-03-01HouseAdded to Professions & Public Health Subcommittee agenda
2021-01-22HouseReferred to Professions and Public Health Subcommittee; Insurance and Banking Subcommittee; Health and Human Services Committee
2021-01-13HouseFiled

Same As/Similar To

S352 (Similar To) 2021-04-26 - Laid on Table, refer to HB 245

Code Citations

ChapterArticleSectionCitation TypeStatute Text
477013Amended CodeSee Bill Text
4770135Amended CodeSee Bill Text
4770265Amended CodeSee Bill Text
480031Amended CodeSee Bill Text
480032Amended CodeSee Bill Text
480033Amended CodeSee Bill Text
480034Amended CodeSee Bill Text
480035Amended CodeSee Bill Text
480041Amended CodeSee Bill Text
480043Amended CodeSee Bill Text
480046Amended CodeSee Bill Text
4800465Amended CodeSee Bill Text
480047Amended CodeSee Bill Text
480052Amended CodeSee Bill Text
4800535Amended CodeSee Bill Text
6276407Amended CodeSee Bill Text
6276619Amended CodeSee Bill Text
627736Amended CodeSee Bill Text
64131Amended CodeSee Bill Text
82305Amended CodeSee Bill Text

Florida State Sources

TypeSource
Summaryhttps://www.flsenate.gov/Session/Bill/2021/245
Texthttps://www.flsenate.gov/Session/Bill/2021/245/BillText/Filed/PDF
Texthttps://www.flsenate.gov/Session/Bill/2021/245/BillText/er/PDF
Supplementhttps://www.flsenate.gov/Session/Bill/2021/245/Analyses/h0245.PPH.PDF
Supplementhttps://www.flsenate.gov/Session/Bill/2021/245/Analyses/h0245a.PPH.PDF
Supplementhttps://www.flsenate.gov/Session/Bill/2021/245/Analyses/h0245b.IBS.PDF
Supplementhttps://www.flsenate.gov/Session/Bill/2021/245/Analyses/h0245c.IBS.PDF
Supplementhttps://www.flsenate.gov/Session/Bill/2021/245/Analyses/h0245d.HHS.PDF
Supplementhttps://www.flsenate.gov/Session/Bill/2021/245/Analyses/h0245e.HHS.PDF
Supplementhttps://www.flsenate.gov/Session/Bill/2021/245/Analyses/h0245z.PPH.PDF
Roll Callhttps://www.flsenate.gov/Session/Bill/2021/245/Vote/HouseVote_h00245__048.PDF
Roll Callhttps://www.flsenate.gov/Session/Bill/2021/245/Vote/SenateVote_h00245__005.PDF
Roll Callhttps://www.myfloridahouse.gov/Sections/Committees/billvote.aspx?VoteId=57150&IsPCB=0&BillId=70318
Roll Callhttps://www.myfloridahouse.gov/Sections/Committees/billvote.aspx?VoteId=57915&IsPCB=0&BillId=70318
Roll Callhttps://www.myfloridahouse.gov/Sections/Committees/billvote.aspx?VoteId=58797&IsPCB=0&BillId=70318

Bill Comments 750

feedback