FL S0342 | 2021 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Engrossed on April 14 2021 - 50% progression
Action: 2021-04-14 - In Messages
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [HTML]

Summary

Authorizing tax collectors to determine service charges collected by privately owned license plate agents for motor vehicle titles; requiring that additional service charges be itemized and disclosed to the person paying them; requiring a license plate agent to enter into a contract with the tax collector for a certain purpose; requiring tax collectors and approved license plate agents to enter into a memorandum of understanding with the department for a certain purpose, etc.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Pro trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Vehicle and Vessel Registration

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2021-04-14 - Senate - Senate: Third Reading RCS#3 (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2021-04-14HouseIn Messages
2021-04-14SenateImmediately certified
2021-04-14SenateCS passed; YEAS 40 NAYS 0
2021-04-14SenateRead 3rd time
2021-04-14SenateRead 2nd time
2021-04-09SenatePlaced on Special Order Calendar, 04/14/21
2021-04-07SenatePlaced on Calendar, on 2nd reading
2021-04-06SenateFavorable by- Rules; YEAS 16 NAYS 0
2021-04-01SenateOn Committee agenda-- Rules, 04/06/21, 9:30 am, 412 Knott Building
2021-03-19SenateNow in Rules
2021-03-18SenateFavorable by Finance and Tax; YEAS 8 NAYS 0
2021-03-15SenateOn Committee agenda-- Finance and Tax, 03/18/21, 9:00 am, 110 Senate Building
2021-03-10SenateCS by Transportation read 1st time
2021-03-05SenateNow in Finance and Tax
2021-03-05SenatePending reference review under Rule 4.7(2) - (Committee Substitute)
2021-03-03SenateCS by Transportation; YEAS 7 NAYS 0
2021-03-02SenateIntroduced
2021-02-26SenateOn Committee agenda-- Transportation, 03/03/21, 9:30 am, 110 Senate Building
2021-01-11SenateReferred to Transportation; Finance and Tax; Rules
2020-12-21SenateFiled

Same As/Similar To

H621 (Similar To) 2021-03-24 - Added to Second Reading Calendar

Code Citations

ChapterArticleSectionCitation TypeStatute Text
31932Amended CodeSee Bill Text
32003Amended CodeSee Bill Text
32004Amended CodeSee Bill Text
32872Amended CodeSee Bill Text

Florida State Sources

TypeSource
Summaryhttps://www.flsenate.gov/Session/Bill/2021/342
Texthttps://www.flsenate.gov/Session/Bill/2021/342/BillText/Filed/HTML
Texthttps://www.flsenate.gov/Session/Bill/2021/342/BillText/c1/HTML
Amendmenthttps://www.flsenate.gov/Session/Bill/2021/342/Amendment/689206/HTML
Supplementhttps://www.flsenate.gov/Session/Bill/2021/342/Analyses/2021s00342.pre.tr.PDF
Supplementhttps://www.flsenate.gov/Session/Bill/2021/342/Analyses/2021s00342.tr.PDF
Supplementhttps://www.flsenate.gov/Session/Bill/2021/342/Analyses/2021s00342.pre.ft.PDF
Supplementhttps://www.flsenate.gov/Session/Bill/2021/342/Analyses/2021s00342.ft.PDF
Supplementhttps://www.flsenate.gov/Session/Bill/2021/342/Analyses/2021s00342.pre.rc.PDF
Supplementhttps://www.flsenate.gov/Session/Bill/2021/342/Analyses/2021s00342.rc.PDF
Roll Callhttps://www.flsenate.gov/Session/Bill/2021/342/Vote/SenateVote_s00342c1003.PDF

Bill Comments

feedback