FL H0621 | 2021 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 2-1)
Status: Introduced on January 29 2021 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2021-04-26 - Laid on Table; companion bill(s) passed, see CS/SB 342 (Ch. 2021-171)
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on January 29 2021 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2021-04-26 - Laid on Table; companion bill(s) passed, see CS/SB 342 (Ch. 2021-171)
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [PDF]
Summary
Authorizes tax collectors to determine service charges collected by privately owned license plate agents for motor vehicle titles, motor vehicle registrations, & vessel registrations & titles; requires that additional service charges be itemized & disclosed to person paying them; requires license plate agent to enter into contract with tax collector for certain purpose; requires tax collectors & approved license plate agents to enter into memorandum of understanding with DHSMV for certain purpose.
Title
Tax Collectors and Their Approved Agents
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2021-03-24 - House - House Commerce Committee (Y: 21 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2021-03-17 - House - House Infrastructure & Tourism Appropriations Subcommittee (Y: 12 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2021-03-09 - House - House Tourism, Infrastructure & Energy Subcommittee (Y: 15 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2021-03-17 - House - House Infrastructure & Tourism Appropriations Subcommittee (Y: 12 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2021-03-09 - House - House Tourism, Infrastructure & Energy Subcommittee (Y: 15 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-04-26 | House | Laid on Table; companion bill(s) passed, see CS/SB 342 (Ch. 2021-171) |
2021-03-24 | House | Added to Second Reading Calendar |
2021-03-24 | House | Bill released to House Calendar |
2021-03-24 | House | Reported out of Commerce Committee |
2021-03-24 | House | Favorable by Commerce Committee |
2021-03-22 | House | Added to Commerce Committee agenda |
2021-03-17 | House | Now in Commerce Committee |
2021-03-17 | House | Reported out of Infrastructure & Tourism Appropriations Subcommittee |
2021-03-17 | House | Favorable by Infrastructure & Tourism Appropriations Subcommittee |
2021-03-15 | House | Added to Infrastructure & Tourism Appropriations Subcommittee agenda |
2021-03-12 | House | Now in Infrastructure & Tourism Appropriations Subcommittee |
2021-03-12 | House | Referred to Commerce Committee |
2021-03-12 | House | Referred to Infrastructure & Tourism Appropriations Subcommittee |
2021-03-10 | House | 1st Reading (Committee Substitute 1) |
2021-03-10 | House | CS Filed |
2021-03-10 | House | Laid on Table under Rule 7.18(a) |
2021-03-10 | House | Reported out of Tourism, Infrastructure & Energy Subcommittee |
2021-03-09 | House | Favorable with CS by Tourism, Infrastructure & Energy Subcommittee |
2021-03-05 | House | Added to Tourism, Infrastructure & Energy Subcommittee agenda |
2021-03-02 | House | 1st Reading (Original Filed Version) |
2021-02-18 | House | Now in Tourism, Infrastructure & Energy Subcommittee |
2021-02-18 | House | Referred to Commerce Committee |
2021-02-18 | House | Referred to Infrastructure & Tourism Appropriations Subcommittee |
2021-02-18 | House | Referred to Tourism, Infrastructure & Energy Subcommittee |
2021-01-29 | House | Filed |
Same As/Similar To
S342 (Similar To) 2021-07-06 - Chapter No. 2021-171
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
319 | 32 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
320 | 03 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
320 | 04 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
328 | 72 | Amended Code | See Bill Text |