FL S0322 | 2011 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Introduced on January 3 2011 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2011-05-07 - Indefinitely postponed and withdrawn from consideration
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on January 3 2011 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2011-05-07 - Indefinitely postponed and withdrawn from consideration
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Compensates Aaron Edwards, a minor, and his parents, Mitzi Roden and Mark Edwards. Compensates them for damages sustained as a result of the medical negligence by employees of Lee Memorial Health System of Lee County. Provides a limitation on the payment of fees and costs, etc. CLAIM:
Title
Relief/Edwards & Roden/Lee County
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2011-05-07 | Indefinitely postponed and withdrawn from consideration | |
2011-04-29 | Retained on Calendar | |
2011-04-27 | Placed on Calendar, on 2nd reading -SJ 541 | |
2011-04-26 | Favorable by- Rules; YEAS 6 NAYS 4 -SJ 541 | |
2011-04-21 | On Committee agenda-- Rules, 04/26/11, 1:00 pm, 110 Senate Office Building | |
2011-04-20 | Also referred to Rules -SJ 472 | |
2011-03-08 | Introduced -SJ 32 | |
2011-01-18 | Referred to Special Master on Claim Bills -SJ 33 | |
2011-01-03 | Filed |
Same As/Similar To
H1073 () 2011-05-07 - Indefinitely postponed and withdrawn from consideration
Florida State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | http://www.flsenate.gov/Session/Bill/2011/322 |
Text | http://www.flsenate.gov/Session/Bill/2011/0322/BillText/Filed/HTML |