FL S0308 | 2010 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Failed on April 30 2010 - 100% progression
Action: 2010-04-30 - Died in Committee on Transportation
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Failed on April 30 2010 - 100% progression
Action: 2010-04-30 - Died in Committee on Transportation
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [HTML]
Summary
Requires a physician or person having knowledge of a licensed driver's or applicant's mental or physical disability to drive or need to wear a medical identification bracelet to report such knowledge to the HSMV, etc.
Title
Disorders/Ability to Operate a Motor Vehicle [SPSC]
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2010-04-30 | Died in Committee on Transportation | |
2010-03-02 | -SJ 00153; Pending reference review under Rule 4.7(2) - (Committee Substitute); Original reference(s) removed: Governmental Oversight and Accountability; Remaining references corrected to Transportation; Judiciary; Policy & Steering Committee on Ways and Means -SJ 00160; Now in Transportation -SJ 00164 | |
2010-03-02 | Introduced, referred to Health Regulation; Transportation; Governmental Oversight and Accountability; Policy & Steering Committee on Ways and Means -SJ 00030; On Committee agenda-- Health Regulation, 01/19/10, 10:30 am, 412-K; CS by Health Regulation; YEAS 7 NAYS 0 -SJ 00164; CS read 1st time on | |
2010-01-28 | Original reference(s) removed: Governmental Oversight and Accountability; Remaining references corrected to Transportation; Judiciary; Policy & Steering Committee on Ways and Means; Now in Transportation | |
2010-01-20 | Pending reference review under Rule 4.7(2) - (Committee Substitute) | |
2010-01-19 | CS by Health Regulation; YEAS 7 NAYS 0 | |
2010-01-12 | On Committee agenda-- Health Regulation, 01/19/10, 10:30 am, 412-K | |
2009-12-09 | Referred to Health Regulation; Transportation; Governmental Oversight and Accountability; Policy & Steering Committee on Ways and Means | |
2009-10-05 | Filed |