FL S0282 | 2013 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on June 10 2013 - 100% progression
Action: 2013-06-10 - Chapter No. 2013-124
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on June 10 2013 - 100% progression
Action: 2013-06-10 - Chapter No. 2013-124
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Summary
Increasing the proportionate loan amounts that are subject to descending maximum rates of interest; increasing the maximum delinquency charge that may be imposed for each loan payment in default for not less than a specified time; providing penalties, etc.
Title
Consumer Finance Charges
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2013-05-01 - House - House: Third Reading RCS#368 (Y: 109 N: 6 NV: 4 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2013-04-24 - Senate - Senate: Third Reading RCS#7 (Y: 31 N: 3 NV: 5 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2013-04-24 - Senate - Senate: Third Reading RCS#7 (Y: 31 N: 3 NV: 5 Abs: 1) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2013-06-10 | Chapter No. 2013-124 | |
2013-06-07 | Approved by Governor | |
2013-05-28 | Signed by Officers and presented to Governor | |
2013-05-01 | Senate | Ordered enrolled |
2013-05-01 | House | Passed; YEAS 109 NAYS 6 |
2013-05-01 | House | Read 3rd time |
2013-04-30 | House | Placed on 3rd reading |
2013-04-30 | House | Substituted for HB 425 |
2013-04-30 | House | Read 2nd time |
2013-04-29 | House | Received |
2013-04-29 | House | Placed on Special Order Calendar, 04/30/13 |
2013-04-29 | House | Referred to Calendar |
2013-04-26 | House | In Messages |
2013-04-24 | Senate | Passed; YEAS 31 NAYS 3 |
2013-04-24 | Senate | Read 3rd time |
2013-04-16 | Senate | Placed on 3rd reading |
2013-04-16 | Senate | Read 2nd time |
2013-04-11 | Senate | Placed on Special Order Calendar, 04/16/13 |
2013-04-08 | Senate | Placed on Calendar, on 2nd reading |
2013-04-08 | Senate | Favorable by- Commerce and Tourism; YEAS 11 NAYS 0 |
2013-04-03 | Senate | On Committee agenda-- Commerce and Tourism, 04/08/13, 1:00 pm, 110 Senate Office Building |
2013-03-21 | Senate | Now in Commerce and Tourism |
2013-03-20 | Senate | Favorable by Banking and Insurance; YEAS 11 NAYS 0 |
2013-03-15 | Senate | On Committee agenda-- Banking and Insurance, 03/20/13, 3:00 pm, 110 Senate Office Building |
2013-03-05 | Senate | Introduced |
2013-01-17 | Senate | Referred to Banking and Insurance; Commerce and Tourism |
2013-01-14 | Senate | Filed |
Same As/Similar To
H0425 (Same As) 2013-04-30 - Laid on Table, companion bill(s) passed, see SB 282 (Ch. 2013-124)
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
516 | 031 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
516 | 19 | Amended Code | See Bill Text |