FL S0274 | 2023 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 3-1)
Status: Engrossed on March 24 2023 - 50% progression
Action: 2023-03-24 - In Messages
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on March 24 2023 - 50% progression
Action: 2023-03-24 - In Messages
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Revising a primary goal of the Florida Center for Nursing to provide that development of a statewide plan for nursing manpower must include the encouragement and coordination of the development of partnerships with hospitals which provide opportunities for nursing students to obtain clinical experience; requiring that the Articulation Coordinating Committee convene a workgroup to establish a process for determining postsecondary course equivalencies and the minimum postsecondary credit or career education clock hours that must be awarded in accredited nursing education programs for military training and education required for service in specified positions; authorizing the award of additional postsecondary credit or career education clock hours, etc.
Title
Nursing Education Pathway for Military Combat Medics
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2023-03-22 - Senate - Senate: Third Reading RCS#2 (Y: 39 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2023-03-08 - Senate - Senate Rules (Y: 19 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2023-02-20 - Senate - Senate Health Policy (Y: 10 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2023-02-08 - Senate - Senate Education Postsecondary (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2023-03-08 - Senate - Senate Rules (Y: 19 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2023-02-20 - Senate - Senate Health Policy (Y: 10 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2023-02-08 - Senate - Senate Education Postsecondary (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2023-03-24 | House | In Messages |
2023-03-22 | Senate | Passed; YEAS 39 NAYS 0 |
2023-03-22 | Senate | Read 3rd time |
2023-03-22 | Senate | Read 2nd time |
2023-03-20 | Senate | Placed on Special Order Calendar, 03/22/23 |
2023-03-09 | Senate | Placed on Calendar, on 2nd reading |
2023-03-08 | Senate | Favorable by- Rules; YEAS 19 NAYS 0 |
2023-03-07 | Senate | Introduced |
2023-03-03 | Senate | On Committee agenda-- Rules, 03/08/23, 1:30 pm, 412 Knott Building |
2023-02-21 | Senate | Now in Rules |
2023-02-20 | Senate | Favorable by Health Policy; YEAS 10 NAYS 0 |
2023-02-13 | Senate | On Committee agenda-- Health Policy, 02/20/23, 3:00 pm, 110 Senate Building |
2023-02-08 | Senate | Now in Health Policy |
2023-02-08 | Senate | Favorable by Education Postsecondary; YEAS 9 NAYS 0 |
2023-01-30 | Senate | On Committee agenda-- Education Postsecondary, 02/08/23, 9:30 am, 110 Senate Building |
2023-01-26 | Senate | Referred to Education Postsecondary; Health Policy; Rules |
2023-01-18 | Senate | Filed |
Same As/Similar To
H517 (Same As) 2023-03-15 - Now in Education & Employment Committee
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
1004 | 096 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
464 | 0195 | Amended Code | See Bill Text |