FL H0517 | 2023 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 9-4)
Status: Introduced on January 25 2023 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2023-05-01 - Laid on Table; companion bill(s) passed, see SB 274 (Ch. 2023-158)
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on January 25 2023 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2023-05-01 - Laid on Table; companion bill(s) passed, see SB 274 (Ch. 2023-158)
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Revising a primary goal of the Florida Center for Nursing to provide that development of a statewide plan for nursing manpower must include the encouragement and coordination of the development of partnerships with hospitals which provide opportunities for nursing students to obtain clinical experience; requiring that the Articulation Coordinating Committee convene a workgroup to establish a process for determining postsecondary course equivalencies and the minimum postsecondary credit or career education clock hours that must be awarded in accredited nursing education programs for military training and education required for service in specified positions; authorizing the award of additional postsecondary credit or career education clock hours.
Title
Nursing Education for Military Combat Medics
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2023-03-31 - House - House Education & Employment Committee (Y: 21 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2023-03-15 - House - House Higher Education Appropriations Subcommittee (Y: 14 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2023-03-07 - House - House Postsecondary Education & Workforce Subcommittee (Y: 17 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2023-03-15 - House - House Higher Education Appropriations Subcommittee (Y: 14 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2023-03-07 - House - House Postsecondary Education & Workforce Subcommittee (Y: 17 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2023-05-01 | House | Laid on Table; companion bill(s) passed, see SB 274 (Ch. 2023-158) |
2023-03-31 | House | Added to Second Reading Calendar |
2023-03-31 | House | Bill released to House Calendar |
2023-03-31 | House | Reported out of Education & Employment Committee |
2023-03-31 | House | Favorable by Education & Employment Committee |
2023-03-29 | House | Added to Education & Employment Committee agenda |
2023-03-15 | House | Now in Education & Employment Committee |
2023-03-15 | House | Reported out of Higher Education Appropriations Subcommittee |
2023-03-15 | House | Favorable by Higher Education Appropriations Subcommittee |
2023-03-13 | House | Added to Higher Education Appropriations Subcommittee agenda |
2023-03-07 | House | 1st Reading (Original Filed Version) |
2023-03-07 | House | Now in Higher Education Appropriations Subcommittee |
2023-03-07 | House | Reported out of Postsecondary Education & Workforce Subcommittee |
2023-03-07 | House | Favorable by Postsecondary Education & Workforce Subcommittee |
2023-03-03 | House | Added to Postsecondary Education & Workforce Subcommittee agenda |
2023-02-07 | House | Now in Postsecondary Education & Workforce Subcommittee |
2023-02-07 | House | Referred to Education & Employment Committee |
2023-02-07 | House | Referred to Higher Education Appropriations Subcommittee |
2023-02-07 | House | Referred to Postsecondary Education & Workforce Subcommittee |
2023-01-25 | House | Filed |
Same As/Similar To
S274 (Same As) 2023-05-26 - Chapter No. 2023-158
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
1004 | 096 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
464 | 0195 | Amended Code | See Bill Text |