FL S0266 | 2021 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Introduced on December 14 2020 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2021-04-28 - Laid on Table, companion bill(s) passed, see CS/HB 403 (Ch. 2021-202), CS/HB 663 (Ch. 2021-211)
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on December 14 2020 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2021-04-28 - Laid on Table, companion bill(s) passed, see CS/HB 403 (Ch. 2021-202), CS/HB 663 (Ch. 2021-211)
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [HTML]
Summary
Specifying conditions under which a business is considered a home-based business; providing requirements for home-based businesses; authorizing a home-based business to operate in an area zoned for residential use; specifying that home-based businesses are subject to certain business taxes; providing prohibitions and authorizations for local governmental actions relating to home-based businesses, etc.
Title
Home-based Businesses
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2021-04-14 - Senate - Senate Rules (Y: 12 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2021-03-22 - Senate - Senate Commerce and Tourism (Y: 9 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-03-10 - Senate - Senate Community Affairs (Y: 6 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-03-22 - Senate - Senate Commerce and Tourism (Y: 9 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-03-10 - Senate - Senate Community Affairs (Y: 6 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-04-28 | Senate | Laid on Table, companion bill(s) passed, see CS/HB 403 (Ch. 2021-202), CS/HB 663 (Ch. 2021-211) |
2021-04-28 | Senate | Substituted CS/HB 403 |
2021-04-28 | Senate | Read 2nd time |
2021-04-27 | Senate | Placed on Special Order Calendar, 04/28/21 |
2021-04-19 | Senate | Placed on Calendar, on 2nd reading |
2021-04-14 | Senate | CS/CS by Rules read 1st time |
2021-04-14 | Senate | Pending reference review -under Rule 4.7(2) - (Committee Substitute) |
2021-04-14 | Senate | CS/CS by- Rules; YEAS 12 NAYS 2 |
2021-04-09 | Senate | On Committee agenda-- Rules, 04/14/21, 9:00 am, 412 Knott Building |
2021-03-23 | Senate | Now in Rules |
2021-03-22 | Senate | Favorable by Commerce and Tourism; YEAS 9 NAYS 2 |
2021-03-17 | Senate | On Committee agenda-- Commerce and Tourism, 03/22/21, 3:30 pm, 110 Senate Building |
2021-03-16 | Senate | CS by Community Affairs read 1st time |
2021-03-12 | Senate | Now in Commerce and Tourism |
2021-03-12 | Senate | Pending reference review under Rule 4.7(2) - (Committee Substitute) |
2021-03-10 | Senate | CS by Community Affairs; YEAS 6 NAYS 3 |
2021-03-05 | Senate | On Committee agenda-- Community Affairs, 03/10/21, 8:00 am, 37 Senate Building |
2021-03-02 | Senate | Introduced |
2020-12-21 | Senate | Referred to Community Affairs; Commerce and Tourism; Rules |
2020-12-14 | Senate | Filed |
Same As/Similar To
H403 (Similar To) 2021-07-06 - Chapter No. 2021-202; companion bill(s) passed, see CS/HB 663 (Ch. 2021-211)
H663 (Similar To) 2021-07-06 - Chapter No. 2021-211; companion bill(s) passed, see CS/HB 403 (Ch. 2021-202)
H663 (Similar To) 2021-07-06 - Chapter No. 2021-211; companion bill(s) passed, see CS/HB 403 (Ch. 2021-202)