FL S0248 | 2020 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Failed on March 14 2020 - 100% progression
Action: 2020-03-14 - Died in Messages
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Failed on March 14 2020 - 100% progression
Action: 2020-03-14 - Died in Messages
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Providing an exemption from public records requirements for the personal identifying and location information of current and former county attorneys and assistant county attorneys and the names and personal identifying and location information of the spouses and children of such attorneys; providing a statement of public necessity, etc.
Title
Public Records/County Attorneys and Assistant County Attorneys
Sponsors
Sen. Ed Hooper [R] |
Roll Calls
2020-03-05 - Senate - Senate: Third Reading RCS#12 (Y: 36 N: 3 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-03-14 | House | Died in Messages |
2020-03-14 | House | Indefinitely postponed and withdrawn from consideration |
2020-03-05 | House | In Messages |
2020-03-05 | Senate | Passed; YEAS 36 NAYS 3 |
2020-03-05 | Senate | Read 3rd time |
2020-03-04 | Senate | Placed on 3rd reading |
2020-03-04 | Senate | Read 2nd time |
2020-03-02 | Senate | Placed on Special Order Calendar, 03/04/20 |
2020-01-29 | Senate | Placed on Calendar, on 2nd reading |
2020-01-29 | Senate | Favorable by- Rules; YEAS 12 NAYS 3 |
2020-01-24 | Senate | On Committee agenda-- Rules, 01/29/20, 1:30 pm, 110 Senate Building |
2020-01-14 | Senate | Introduced |
2019-12-09 | Senate | Now in Rules |
2019-12-09 | Senate | Favorable by Governmental Oversight and Accountability; YEAS 4 NAYS 0 |
2019-12-02 | Senate | On Committee agenda-- Governmental Oversight and Accountability, 12/09/19, 1:30 pm, 301 Senate Building |
2019-11-06 | Senate | Now in Governmental Oversight and Accountability |
2019-11-05 | Senate | Favorable by Judiciary; YEAS 6 NAYS 0 |
2019-10-28 | Senate | On Committee agenda-- Judiciary, 11/05/19, 2:00 pm, 110 Senate Building |
2019-09-19 | Senate | Referred to Judiciary; Governmental Oversight and Accountability; Rules |
2019-09-10 | Senate | Filed |
Same As/Similar To
H63 (Same As) 2020-03-14 - Died in Oversight, Transparency and Public Management Subcommittee