FL H0063 | 2020 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Failed on March 14 2020 - 100% progression
Action: 2020-03-14 - Died in Oversight, Transparency and Public Management Subcommittee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Failed on March 14 2020 - 100% progression
Action: 2020-03-14 - Died in Oversight, Transparency and Public Management Subcommittee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Provides exemption from public records requirements for personal identifying & location information of current & former county attorneys & assistant county attorneys & names & personal identifying & location information of spouses & children of such attorneys; provides statement of public necessity.
Title
Pub. Rec./County Attorneys and Assistant County Attorneys
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-03-14 | House | Died in Oversight, Transparency and Public Management Subcommittee |
2020-03-14 | House | Indefinitely postponed and withdrawn from consideration |
2020-01-14 | House | Introduced |
2019-09-23 | House | Referred to Oversight, Transparency and Public Management Subcommittee; Civil Justice Subcommittee; State Affairs Committee |
2019-08-15 | House | Filed |
Same As/Similar To
S248 (Same As) 2020-03-14 - Died in Messages
Code Citations
Florida State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.flsenate.gov/Session/Bill/2020/63 |
Text | https://www.flsenate.gov/Session/Bill/2020/63/BillText/Filed/PDF |