FL S0244 | 2022 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 3-0)
Status: Failed on March 14 2022 - 100% progression
Action: 2022-03-14 - Died in Education
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 3-0)
Status: Failed on March 14 2022 - 100% progression
Action: 2022-03-14 - Died in Education
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Proposing amendments to the State Constitution to require members of a district school board to be elected in a partisan election, etc.
Title
Partisan Elections for Members of District School Boards
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2021-11-30 - Senate - Senate Ethics and Elections (Y: 5 N: 4 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-03-14 | Senate | Died in Education |
2022-03-12 | Senate | Indefinitely postponed and withdrawn from consideration |
2022-01-11 | Senate | Introduced |
2021-12-01 | Senate | Now in Education |
2021-11-30 | Senate | Favorable by Ethics and Elections; YEAS 5 NAYS 4 |
2021-11-22 | Senate | On Committee agenda-- Ethics and Elections, 11/30/21, 3:30 pm, 110 Senate Building |
2021-10-13 | Senate | Referred to Ethics and Elections; Education; Rules |
2021-09-16 | Senate | Filed |
Same As/Similar To
H35 (Similar To) 2022-03-14 - Died in Secondary Education & Career Development Subcommittee