FL H0035 | 2022 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 6-0)
Status: Failed on March 14 2022 - 100% progression
Action: 2022-03-14 - Died in Secondary Education & Career Development Subcommittee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 6-0)
Status: Failed on March 14 2022 - 100% progression
Action: 2022-03-14 - Died in Secondary Education & Career Development Subcommittee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Proposing amendments to State Constitution to require members of district school board to be elected in partisan election.
Title
Partisan Elections for Members of District School Boards
Sponsors
Rep. Spencer Roach [R] | Rep. Tyler Sirois [R] | Rep. Randy Fine [R] | Rep. Mike Giallombardo [R] |
Rep. Jenna Persons-Mulicka [R] | Rep. Anthony Sabatini [R] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-03-14 | House | Died in Secondary Education & Career Development Subcommittee |
2022-03-12 | House | Indefinitely postponed and withdrawn from consideration |
2022-01-11 | House | 1st Reading (Original Filed Version) |
2021-09-17 | House | Now in Secondary Education & Career Development Subcommittee |
2021-09-17 | House | Referred to Education & Employment Committee |
2021-09-17 | House | Referred to Public Integrity & Elections Committee |
2021-09-17 | House | Referred to Secondary Education & Career Development Subcommittee |
2021-08-12 | House | Filed |
Same As/Similar To
S244 (Similar To) 2022-03-14 - Died in Education
Florida State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.flsenate.gov/Session/Bill/2022/35 |
Text | https://www.flsenate.gov/Session/Bill/2022/35/BillText/Filed/PDF |