FL S0234 | 2017 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Failed on May 5 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-05-05 - Died in Messages
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [HTML]
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Failed on May 5 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-05-05 - Died in Messages
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [HTML]
Summary
Requiring a specified appropriation for certain projects related to the St. Johns River and its tributaries or the Keystone Lake Region, etc.
Title
Land Acquisition Trust Fund
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2017-04-13 - Senate - Senate: Third Reading RCS#2 (Y: 35 N: 0 NV: 4 Abs: 1) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2017-05-05 | House | Died in Messages |
2017-05-05 | House | Indefinitely postponed and withdrawn from consideration |
2017-04-18 | House | In Messages |
2017-04-13 | Senate | CS passed as amended; YEAS 35 NAYS 0 |
2017-04-13 | Senate | Read 3rd time |
2017-04-12 | Senate | Placed on 3rd reading |
2017-04-12 | Senate | Ordered engrossed |
2017-04-12 | Senate | Amendment(s) adopted (543234) |
2017-04-12 | Senate | Read 2nd time |
2017-04-11 | Senate | CS/CS by Appropriations read 1st time |
2017-04-07 | Senate | Placed on Special Order Calendar, 04/12/17 |
2017-04-07 | Senate | Placed on Calendar, on 2nd reading |
2017-04-07 | Senate | Pending reference review -under Rule 4.7(2) - (Committee Substitute) |
2017-04-05 | Senate | CS/CS by- Appropriations; YEAS 17 NAYS 0 |
2017-03-31 | Senate | On Committee agenda-- Appropriations, 04/05/17, 10:00 am, 412 Knott Building |
2017-03-09 | Senate | Now in Appropriations |
2017-03-08 | Senate | Subcommittee Recommendation: CS/CS by Appropriations Subcommittee on the Environment and Natural Resources; YEAS 6 NAYS 0 |
2017-03-07 | Senate | CS by Environmental Preservation and Conservation read 1st time |
2017-03-07 | Senate | Introduced |
2017-03-03 | Senate | On Committee agenda-- Appropriations Subcommittee on the Environment and Natural Resources, 03/08/17, 9:30 am, 301 Senate Office Building |
2017-02-24 | Senate | Now in Appropriations Subcommittee on the Environment and Natural Resources |
2017-02-22 | Senate | Pending reference review under Rule 4.7(2) - (Committee Substitute) |
2017-02-21 | Senate | CS by Environmental Preservation and Conservation; YEAS 5 NAYS 0 |
2017-02-13 | Senate | On Committee agenda-- Environmental Preservation and Conservation, 02/21/17, 3:30 pm, 37 Senate Office Building |
2017-01-12 | Senate | Referred to Environmental Preservation and Conservation; Appropriations Subcommittee on the Environment and Natural Resources; Appropriations |
2017-01-03 | Senate | Filed |
Same As/Similar To
S0982 (Similar To) 2017-05-05 - Died in Appropriations Subcommittee on the Environment and Natural Resources
H0847 (Same As) 2017-05-05 - Died in Agriculture and Natural Resources Appropriations Subcommittee
H1033 (Similar To) 2017-05-05 - Died in Agriculture and Natural Resources Appropriations Subcommittee
H0847 (Same As) 2017-05-05 - Died in Agriculture and Natural Resources Appropriations Subcommittee
H1033 (Similar To) 2017-05-05 - Died in Agriculture and Natural Resources Appropriations Subcommittee