FL S0212 | 2022 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 3-0)
Status: Failed on March 14 2022 - 100% progression
Action: 2022-03-14 - Died in Health Policy
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 3-0)
Status: Failed on March 14 2022 - 100% progression
Action: 2022-03-14 - Died in Health Policy
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Citing this act as the "Let Kids Play Act"; repealing provisions relating to the Fairness in Women's Sports Act, etc.
Title
Fairness in Women's Sports Act
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-03-14 | Senate | Died in Health Policy |
2022-03-12 | Senate | Indefinitely postponed and withdrawn from consideration |
2022-01-11 | Senate | Introduced |
2021-09-21 | Senate | Referred to Health Policy; Education; Rules |
2021-09-14 | Senate | Filed |
Same As/Similar To
H6065 (Similar To) 2022-03-14 - Died in Secondary Education & Career Development Subcommittee
Code Citations
Florida State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.flsenate.gov/Session/Bill/2022/212 |
Text | https://www.flsenate.gov/Session/Bill/2022/212/BillText/Filed/HTML |