FL H6065 | 2022 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 6-0)
Status: Failed on March 14 2022 - 100% progression
Action: 2022-03-14 - Died in Secondary Education & Career Development Subcommittee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 6-0)
Status: Failed on March 14 2022 - 100% progression
Action: 2022-03-14 - Died in Secondary Education & Career Development Subcommittee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Repeals Fairness in Women's Sports Act.
Title
Fairness in Women's Sports Act
Sponsors
Rep. Kristen Arrington [D] | Rep. Dan Daley [D] | Rep. Anna Eskamani [D] | Rep. Joseph Geller [D] |
Rep. Joy Goff-Marcil [D] | Sen. Geraldine Thompson [D] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-03-14 | House | Died in Secondary Education & Career Development Subcommittee |
2022-03-12 | House | Indefinitely postponed and withdrawn from consideration |
2022-01-11 | House | 1st Reading (Original Filed Version) |
2021-11-05 | House | Now in Secondary Education & Career Development Subcommittee |
2021-11-05 | House | Referred to Education & Employment Committee |
2021-11-05 | House | Referred to Post-Secondary Education & Lifelong Learning Subcommittee |
2021-11-05 | House | Referred to Secondary Education & Career Development Subcommittee |
2021-10-21 | House | Filed |
Same As/Similar To
S212 (Similar To) 2022-03-14 - Died in Health Policy
Code Citations
Florida State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.flsenate.gov/Session/Bill/2022/6065 |
Text | https://www.flsenate.gov/Session/Bill/2022/6065/BillText/Filed/PDF |