FL S0210 | 2018 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on March 7 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-03-07 - Adopted
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on March 7 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-03-07 - Adopted
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Recognizing August 15, 2018, as "India Independence Day" and August 2018 as "India Heritage Month" in Florida, etc.
Title
India Independence Day/India Heritage Month
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2018-03-07 - Senate - Senate: Third Reading RCS#3 (Y: 34 N: 0 NV: 4 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-03-07 | Senate | Adopted |
2018-03-07 | Senate | Read 2nd time 786 |
2018-03-05 | Senate | Placed on Special Order Calendar, 03/07/18 |
2018-02-22 | Senate | Placed on Calendar, on 2nd reading |
2018-02-22 | Senate | Favorable by- Rules; YEAS 12 NAYS 0 |
2018-02-19 | Senate | On Committee agenda-- Rules, 02/22/18, 10:00 am, 110 Senate Office Building |
2018-01-17 | Senate | Now in Rules |
2018-01-16 | Senate | Favorable by Commerce and Tourism; YEAS 8 NAYS 0 |
2018-01-11 | Senate | On Committee agenda-- Commerce and Tourism, 01/16/18, 1:30 pm, 110 Senate Office Building |
2018-01-09 | Senate | Introduced |
2017-09-22 | Senate | Referred to Commerce and Tourism; Rules |
2017-08-23 | Senate | Filed |
Same As/Similar To
H8039 (Same As) 2018-02-14 - Adopted by Publication