FL S0192 | 2013 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Failed on May 3 2013 - 100% progression
Action: 2013-05-03 - Died in Commerce and Tourism
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Failed on May 3 2013 - 100% progression
Action: 2013-05-03 - Died in Commerce and Tourism
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Requiring the Department of Economic Opportunity to create economic development zones for science, technology, engineering, and mathematics; authorizing a STEM zone in counties with a state university classified as having very high research activity located in its jurisdiction; providing that the incentives and benefits provided for enterprise zones are available to the STEM zones; requiring the department to work with the STEM zone development agency, the Department of Education, and Workforce Florida, Inc., to develop accountability requirements and measurable objectives, etc.
Title
Targeted Economic Development
Sponsors
Sen. John Legg [R] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2013-05-03 | Senate | Died in Commerce and Tourism |
2013-03-05 | Senate | Introduced |
2013-01-11 | Senate | Referred to Commerce and Tourism; Education; Appropriations Subcommittee on Finance and Tax; Appropriations |
2013-01-07 | Senate | Filed |
Same As/Similar To
H0299 (Same As) 2013-05-03 - Died in Economic Development and Tourism Subcommittee
Florida State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | http://www.flsenate.gov/Session/Bill/2013/192 |
Text | http://www.flsenate.gov/Session/Bill/2013/0192/BillText/Filed/HTML |