FL S0190 | 2018 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 4-0)
Status: Failed on March 10 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-03-10 - Died in Appropriations
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]

Summary

Requiring that the Technology Program within the Department of Management Services develop and implement a plan to require that emergency dispatchers be able to transfer an emergency call from one E911 system to another E911 system in the state, etc.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

E911 Systems

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2018-03-10SenateDied in Appropriations
2018-03-10SenateIndefinitely postponed and withdrawn from consideration
2018-02-12SenateNow in Appropriations
2018-02-08SenateSubcommittee Recommendation: CS by Appropriations Subcommittee on General Government; YEAS 10 NAYS 0
2018-02-05SenateOn Committee agenda-- Appropriations Subcommittee on General Government, 02/08/18, 12:30 pm, 301 Senate Office Building
2018-01-25SenateNow in Appropriations Subcommittee on General Government
2018-01-25SenateFavorable by Communications, Energy, and Public Utilities; YEAS 6 NAYS 0
2018-01-22SenateOn Committee agenda-- Communications, Energy, and Public Utilities, 01/25/18, 10:00 am, 301 Senate Office Building
2018-01-09SenateIntroduced
2017-08-28SenateReferred to Communications, Energy, and Public Utilities; Appropriations Subcommittee on General Government; Appropriations
2017-08-22SenateFiled

Same As/Similar To

H1057 (Similar To) 2018-03-10 - Died on Calendar

Code Citations

ChapterArticleSectionCitation TypeStatute Text
365172Amended CodeSee Bill Text
365176Amended CodeSee Bill Text

Florida State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback