FL H1057 | 2018 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Introduced on December 21 2017 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2018-03-10 - Died on Calendar
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [PDF]

Summary

Requires Technology Program within DMS to develop plan to upgrade 911 public safety answer points to allow transfer of emergency calls from one E911 system to another one in state.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

E911 Systems

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2018-03-10HouseDied on Calendar
2018-03-10HouseIndefinitely postponed and withdrawn from consideration
2018-02-22HousePlaced on Calendar
2018-02-22HouseFavorable by- Commerce Committee; YEAS 24 NAYS 0
2018-02-20HouseOn Committee agenda-- Commerce Committee, 02/22/18, 9:00 am, Webster Hall
2018-02-19HouseNow in Commerce Committee
2018-02-14HouseCS by Government Operations and Technology Appropriations Subcommittee read 1st time
2018-02-14HousePending review of CS under Rule 7.18(c)
2018-02-13HouseCS by Government Operations and Technology Appropriations Subcommittee; YEAS 11 NAYS 0
2018-02-09HouseOn Committee agenda-- Government Operations and Technology Appropriations Subcommittee, 02/13/18, 9:30 am, Morris Hall
2018-01-29HouseNow in Government Operations and Technology Appropriations Subcommittee
2018-01-29HouseFavorable by Energy and Utilities Subcommittee; YEAS 9 NAYS 0
2018-01-25HouseOn Committee agenda-- Energy and Utilities Subcommittee, 01/29/18, 3:00 pm, Webster Hall
2018-01-09HouseIntroduced
2018-01-03HouseReferred to Energy and Utilities Subcommittee; Government Operations and Technology Appropriations Subcommittee; Commerce Committee
2017-12-21HouseFiled

Same As/Similar To

S190 (Similar To) 2018-03-10 - Died in Appropriations

Code Citations

ChapterArticleSectionCitation TypeStatute Text
365172Amended CodeSee Bill Text
365176Amended CodeSee Bill Text

Florida State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback