FL S0184 | 2019 | Regular Session

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on April 29 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-04-29 - Chapter No. 2019-11
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]

Summary

Transferring the powers, duties, and functions of the Department of Elderly Affairs relating to hospices, assisted living facilities, adult family-care homes, and adult day care centers to the Agency for Health Care Administration; establishing that the agency is the lead agency responsible for the regulation of hospices, assisted living facilities, adult day care centers, and adult family-care homes, etc.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Aging Programs

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2019-04-11 - House - House: Third Reading RCS#66 (Y: 116 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-03-21 - Senate - Senate: Third Reading RCS#3 (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2019-04-29 Chapter No. 2019-11
2019-04-26 Approved by Governor
2019-04-22 Signed by Officers and presented to Governor
2019-04-18SenateOrdered enrolled
2019-04-11HouseCS passed; YEAS 116 NAYS 0
2019-04-11HouseRead 3rd time
2019-04-10HousePlaced on 3rd reading
2019-04-10HouseRead 2nd time
2019-04-10HouseSubstituted for CS/HB 7019
2019-04-04HouseReceived
2019-04-04HousePlaced on Special Order Calendar, 04/10/19
2019-04-04HouseReferred to Calendar
2019-03-21HouseIn Messages
2019-03-21SenateImmediately certified
2019-03-21SenateCS passed as amended; YEAS 40 NAYS 0
2019-03-21SenateRead 3rd time
2019-03-14SenatePlaced on 3rd reading
2019-03-14SenateOrdered engrossed
2019-03-14SenateAmendment(s) adopted (590476)
2019-03-14SenateRead 2nd time
2019-03-13SenateCS by Appropriations read 1st time
2019-03-11SenatePlaced on Special Order Calendar, 03/14/19
2019-03-11SenatePlaced on Calendar, on 2nd reading
2019-03-11SenatePending reference review -under Rule 4.7(2) - (Committee Substitute)
2019-03-07SenateCS by- Appropriations; YEAS 21 NAYS 0
2019-03-05SenateIntroduced
2019-03-04SenateOn Committee agenda-- Appropriations, 03/07/19, 10:00 am, 412 Knott Building
2019-02-20SenateNow in Appropriations
2019-02-20SenateSubcommittee Recommendation: Favorable by Appropriations Subcommittee on Health and Human Services; YEAS 10 NAYS 0
2019-02-12SenateOn Committee agenda-- Appropriations Subcommittee on Health and Human Services, 02/20/19, 1:30 pm, 412 Knott Building
2019-02-12SenateNow in Appropriations Subcommittee on Health and Human Services
2019-02-11SenateFavorable by Children, Families, and Elder Affairs; YEAS 6 NAYS 0
2019-02-04SenateOn Committee agenda-- Children, Families, and Elder Affairs, 02/11/19, 4:30 pm, 301 Senate Building
2019-02-01SenateReferred to Children, Families, and Elder Affairs; Appropriations Subcommittee on Health and Human Services; Appropriations
2019-01-30SenateFiled

Same As/Similar To

H7019 (Similar To) 2019-04-10 - Laid on Table, refer to CS/SB 184
S1592 (Similar To) 2019-05-03 - Died in Appropriations
H1349 (Similar To) 2019-05-03 - Died in Children, Families, and Elder Affairs

Code Citations

ChapterArticleSectionCitation TypeStatute Text
2006Amended CodeSee Bill Text
2041Amended CodeSee Bill Text
2042Amended CodeSee Bill Text
400605Amended CodeSee Bill Text
40060501Amended CodeSee Bill Text
4006095Amended CodeSee Bill Text
400610Amended CodeSee Bill Text
42902Amended CodeSee Bill Text
42917Amended CodeSee Bill Text
42923Amended CodeSee Bill Text
42924Amended CodeSee Bill Text
429255Amended CodeSee Bill Text
429256Amended CodeSee Bill Text
42927Amended CodeSee Bill Text
429275Amended CodeSee Bill Text
42931Amended CodeSee Bill Text
42934Amended CodeSee Bill Text
42941Amended CodeSee Bill Text
42942Amended CodeSee Bill Text
42952Amended CodeSee Bill Text
42954Amended CodeSee Bill Text
42963Amended CodeSee Bill Text
42967Amended CodeSee Bill Text
42971Amended CodeSee Bill Text
42973Amended CodeSee Bill Text
42975Amended CodeSee Bill Text
42981Amended CodeSee Bill Text
429917Amended CodeSee Bill Text
429918Amended CodeSee Bill Text
429929Amended CodeSee Bill Text
765110Amended CodeSee Bill Text

Florida State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback