FL S1592 | 2019 | Regular Session

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Failed on May 3 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-05-03 - Died in Appropriations
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [HTML]

Summary

Prohibiting a county or municipality from issuing a business tax receipt, rather than an occupational license, to an assisted living facility under certain circumstances; requiring a facility to initiate an investigation of an adverse incident within hours and provide a report of such investigation to the Agency for Health Care Administration within 15 days; including medical examinations within criteria used for admission to an assisted living facility; revising provisions relating to facility staff training requirements, etc.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Assisted Living Facilities

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2019-05-03SenateDied in Appropriations
2019-05-03SenateIndefinitely postponed and withdrawn from consideration
2019-04-16SenateNow in Appropriations
2019-04-16SenateSubcommittee Recommendation: Favorable by Appropriations Subcommittee on Health and Human Services; YEAS 10 NAYS 0
2019-04-11SenateOn Committee agenda-- Appropriations Subcommittee on Health and Human Services, 04/16/19, 1:00 pm, 412 Knott Building
2019-04-10SenateCS by Children, Families, and Elder Affairs read 1st time
2019-04-10SenateNow in Appropriations Subcommittee on Health and Human Services
2019-04-10SenatePending reference review under Rule 4.7(2) - (Committee Substitute)
2019-04-08SenateCS by Children, Families, and Elder Affairs; YEAS 6 NAYS 0
2019-04-03SenateOn Committee agenda-- Children, Families, and Elder Affairs, 04/08/19, 4:00 pm, 301 Senate Building
2019-03-13SenateIntroduced
2019-03-08SenateReferred to Children, Families, and Elder Affairs; Appropriations Subcommittee on Health and Human Services; Appropriations
2019-03-01SenateFiled

Same As/Similar To

H7019 (Similar To) 2019-04-10 - Laid on Table, refer to CS/SB 184
S184 (Similar To) 2019-04-29 - Chapter No. 2019-11
H1349 (Similar To) 2019-05-03 - Died in Children, Families, and Elder Affairs

Code Citations

ChapterArticleSectionCitation TypeStatute Text
42902Amended CodeSee Bill Text
42907Amended CodeSee Bill Text
42911Amended CodeSee Bill Text
429176Amended CodeSee Bill Text
42919Amended CodeSee Bill Text
42923Amended CodeSee Bill Text
429255Amended CodeSee Bill Text
429256Amended CodeSee Bill Text
42926Amended CodeSee Bill Text
42928Amended CodeSee Bill Text
42941Amended CodeSee Bill Text
429435Amended CodeSee Bill Text
42952Amended CodeSee Bill Text

Florida State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback