FL S0174 | 2014 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Failed on May 2 2014 - 100% progression
Action: 2014-05-02 - Died in Health Policy
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Failed on May 2 2014 - 100% progression
Action: 2014-05-02 - Died in Health Policy
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Requiring a physician, to whom a parent or legal guardian reports observing symptoms of autism exhibited by a minor child, to refer the minor to an appropriate specialist for screening for autism spectrum disorder under certain circumstances; requiring that certain insurers and health maintenance organizations provide direct patient access to an appropriate specialist for screening for or evaluation or diagnosis of autism spectrum disorder; requiring that certain insurance policies and health maintenance organization contracts provide a minimum number of visits per year for screening for or evaluation or diagnosis of autism spectrum disorder, etc.
Title
Autism
Sponsors
Sen. Jeremy Ring [D] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2014-05-02 | Senate | Died in Health Policy |
2014-03-04 | Senate | Introduced |
2013-09-25 | Senate | Referred to Health Policy; Banking and Insurance; Appropriations Subcommittee on Health and Human Services; Appropriations |
2013-09-18 | Senate | Filed |
Same As/Similar To
H0483 (Same As) 2014-05-02 - Died in Health Innovation Subcommittee
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
381 | 986 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
627 | 6686 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
641 | 31098 | Amended Code | See Bill Text |
Florida State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | http://www.flsenate.gov/Session/Bill/2014/174 |
Text | http://www.flsenate.gov/Session/Bill/2014/0174/BillText/Filed/HTML |