FL S0098 | 2022 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Introduced on December 21 2021 - 25% progression
Action: 2022-01-13 - Placed on Special Order Calendar, 01/19/22
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]

Summary

Creating the Emergency Preparedness and Response Fund within the Executive Office of the Governor; providing for the deposit and use of funds; providing for future review and termination of the fund, etc.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Pro trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Emergency Preparedness and Response Fund

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2022-01-12 - Senate - Senate Appropriations (Y: 10 N: 6 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [FAIL]

History

DateChamberAction
2022-01-13SenatePlaced on Special Order Calendar, 01/19/22
2022-01-12SenatePlaced on Calendar, on 2nd reading
2022-01-12SenateFavorable by- Appropriations; YEAS 10 NAYS 6
2022-01-11SenateIntroduced
2022-01-07SenateOn Committee agenda-- Appropriations, 01/12/22, 12:30 pm, 412 Knott Building
2021-12-21SenateReferred to Appropriations
2021-12-21SenateFiled

Same As/Similar To

S96 (Related) 2022-01-13 - Placed on Special Order Calendar, 01/19/22

Code Citations

ChapterArticleSectionCitation TypeStatute Text
2523711Amended CodeSee Bill Text

Florida State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback