FL S0096 | 2022 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Engrossed on January 19 2022 - 50% progression
Action: 2022-01-19 - In Messages
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [HTML]

Summary

Authorizing the Legislative Budget Commission to convene to transfer or appropriate certain funds to the Emergency Preparedness and Response Fund; authorizing the Governor to transfer and expend moneys from the Emergency Preparedness and Response Fund; authorizing the Governor to request that additional funds be transferred or appropriated to the Emergency Preparedness and Response Fund, subject to approval by the Legislative Budget Commission, under specified conditions, etc.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Pro trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Emergency Preparedness and Response Fund

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2022-01-19 - Senate - Senate: Third Reading RCS#8 (Y: 31 N: 4 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2022-01-12 - Senate - Senate Appropriations (Y: 9 N: 7 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [FAIL]

History

DateChamberAction
2022-01-19HouseIn Messages
2022-01-19SenateImmediately certified
2022-01-19SenateCS passed as amended; YEAS 31 NAYS 4
2022-01-19SenateRead 3rd time
2022-01-19SenateAmendment(s) adopted (825440)
2022-01-19SenateRead 2nd time
2022-01-18SenateCS by Appropriations read 1st time
2022-01-13SenatePlaced on Special Order Calendar, 01/19/22
2022-01-13SenatePlaced on Calendar, on 2nd reading
2022-01-13SenatePending reference review -under Rule 4.7(2) - (Committee Substitute)
2022-01-12SenateCS by- Appropriations; YEAS 9 NAYS 7
2022-01-11SenateIntroduced
2022-01-07SenateOn Committee agenda-- Appropriations, 01/12/22, 12:30 pm, 412 Knott Building
2021-12-21SenateReferred to Appropriations
2021-12-21SenateFiled

Same As/Similar To

S98 (Related) 2022-01-19 - In Messages
H7025 (Similar To) 2022-01-20 - Now in Appropriations Committee
H7023 (Similar To) 2022-01-20 - Now in Appropriations Committee

Code Citations

ChapterArticleSectionCitation TypeStatute Text
1190Amended CodeSee Bill Text
25237Amended CodeSee Bill Text

Florida State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback