FL S0086 | 2019 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Introduced on November 21 2018 - 25% progression
Action: 2019-03-05 - Introduced
Pending: Senate Judiciary Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]

Summary

Proposing an amendment to the State Constitution to require that any proposals to revise the State Constitution, or any part thereof, filed by the Constitution Revision Commission be limited to a single subject, etc.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Single-subject Limitation for Constitution Revision Commission Proposals

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2019-03-05SenateIntroduced
2019-01-22SenateOn Committee agenda-- Judiciary, 01/22/19, 12:30 pm, 110 Senate Building --Not Considered
2018-12-20SenateOn Committee agenda-- Judiciary, 01/07/19, 4:30 pm, 110 Senate Building --Meeting cancelled
2018-12-13SenateReferred to Judiciary; Ethics and Elections; Rules
2018-11-21SenateFiled

Same As/Similar To

S74 (Similar To) 2019-03-21 - Placed on 3rd reading
H53 (Similar To) 2019-03-05 - Now in Judiciary Committee

Florida State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback