FL H0053 | 2019 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 10-4)
Status: Introduced on November 27 2018 - 25% progression
Action: 2019-02-14 - Now in State Affairs Committee
Pending: House State Affairs Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]

Summary

Proposes amendments to Sections 2 and 6 of Article XI of the State Constitution to limit each revision or amendment to the Constitution proposed by the constitution revision commission or the taxation and budget reform commission to one subject and matter directly connected therewith.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Single Subject Requirement for Revisions or Amendments to the Constitution

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2019-02-14HouseNow in State Affairs Committee
2019-02-13HouseFavorable by Civil Justice Subcommittee; YEAS 14 NAYS 0
2019-02-06HouseOn Committee agenda-- Civil Justice Subcommittee, 02/13/19, 4:00 pm, Sumner Hall
2019-01-03HouseReferred to Civil Justice Subcommittee; State Affairs Committee; Judiciary Committee
2018-11-27HouseFiled

Same As/Similar To

S74 (Similar To) 2019-02-06 - Now in Rules
S86 (Similar To) 2019-01-22 - On Committee agenda-- Judiciary, 01/22/19, 12:30 pm, 110 Senate Building --Not Considered
S690 (Similar To) 2019-02-15 - Referred to Judiciary; Ethics and Elections; Rules

Florida State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback