FL S0074 | 2019 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Introduced on November 20 2018 - 25% progression
Action: 2019-03-21 - Placed on 3rd reading
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]

Summary

Proposing an amendment to the State Constitution to require that any proposals to revise the State Constitution, or any part thereof, filed by the Constitution Revision Commission be limited to a single subject, etc.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Single-subject Limitation for Constitution Revision Commission Proposals

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2019-03-21SenatePlaced on 3rd reading
2019-03-21SenateRead 2nd time
2019-03-18SenatePlaced on Special Order Calendar, 03/21/19
2019-03-13SenatePlaced on Calendar, on 2nd reading
2019-03-13SenateFavorable by- Rules; YEAS 17 NAYS 0
2019-03-08SenateOn Committee agenda-- Rules, 03/13/19, 10:00 am, 110 Senate Building
2019-03-05SenateIntroduced
2019-02-06SenateNow in Rules
2019-02-05SenateFavorable by Ethics and Elections; YEAS 7 NAYS 0
2019-01-28SenateOn Committee agenda-- Ethics and Elections, 02/05/19, 2:00 pm, 412 Knott Building
2019-01-23SenateNow in Ethics and Elections
2019-01-22SenateFavorable by Judiciary; YEAS 6 NAYS 0
2019-01-15SenateOn Committee agenda-- Judiciary, 01/22/19, 12:30 pm, 110 Senate Building
2018-12-20SenateOn Committee agenda-- Judiciary, 01/07/19, 4:30 pm, 110 Senate Building --Meeting cancelled
2018-12-13SenateReferred to Judiciary; Ethics and Elections; Rules
2018-11-20SenateFiled

Same As/Similar To

S86 (Similar To) 2019-03-05 - Introduced
H53 (Similar To) 2019-03-05 - Now in Judiciary Committee

Florida State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback